Nest Or Invest Bollard Limited was incorporated on 28 Jan 2013 and issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030368835. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Jasnish Singh Gujral - an active director whose contract began on 01 Mar 2022,
Sunisha Gujral - an inactive director whose contract began on 28 Jan 2013 and was terminated on 22 Mar 2022.
According to our data (last updated on 10 Sep 2024), the company registered 1 address: 70B Sayegh Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 (types include: registered, physical).
Up until 27 Jul 2017, Nest Or Invest Bollard Limited had been using Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland as their physical address.
BizDb identified former names for the company: from 25 Jan 2013 to 22 Mar 2022 they were named Jvs Group 2013 Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Gujral, Jasnish Singh (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071. Nest Or Invest Bollard Limited has been classified as "Residential property operation and development (excluding site construction)" (business classification L671180).
Previous addresses
Address: Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 21 Aug 2014 to 27 Jul 2017
Address: Level 6/135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 28 Jan 2013 to 21 Aug 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 04 Sep 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Gujral, Jasnish Singh |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
28 Jan 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Gujral, Sunisha |
East Tamaki Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
28 Jan 2013 - 07 Sep 2023 |
Jasnish Singh Gujral - Director
Appointment date: 01 Mar 2022
Address: St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Mar 2022
Sunisha Gujral - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Jan 2013
Termination date: 22 Mar 2022
Address: East Tamaki, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Aug 2016
Arnott's New Zealand Limited
Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited
Level 4, 19 Morgan Street
Your Property Services Limited
Level 4, 19 Morgan Street
Grovers Investments Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Buzzin Apiaries Matamata (2018) Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Hamann Investments Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Max Property Limited
Level 6/135 Broadway
Pattibee Co Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Seveeno Enterprises Limited
Level 6/135 Broadway
West Nz Property Limited
Level 6/135 Broadway