Dalt Investments Limited was started on 12 Mar 2013 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030313545. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 5 directors: Allan Edward Killick - an active director whose contract began on 12 Mar 2013,
Troy Francis Stewart - an active director whose contract began on 12 Mar 2013,
Mark John Revis - an active director whose contract began on 27 May 2013,
Paul Brown - an active director whose contract began on 27 May 2013,
Frederick Michael Jeremy Costeloe - an active director whose contract began on 27 May 2013.
According to our data (last updated on 19 Aug 2024), this company uses 1 address: 16 Southwark Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (types include: physical, service).
Until 06 Dec 2021, Dalt Investments Limited had been using Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch as their physical address.
A total of 600 shares are allotted to 5 groups (13 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 120 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Mushtaq Limited (an entity) located at Papanui, Christchurch postcode 8052.
The 2nd group consists of 3 shareholders, holds 20% shares (exactly 120 shares) and includes
Revis, Mark John - located at Saint Albans, Christchurch,
Pearce, Jedd - located at Rd 1, Kaiapoi,
Tait, Michelle Angela - located at Saint Albans, Christchurch.
The 3rd share allocation (120 shares, 20%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Siver Trustees Limited, located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch (an entity),
Stewart, Troy Francis, located at Cracroft, Christchurch (a director),
Stewart, Carleena, located at Halswell, Christchurch (an individual). Dalt Investments Limited was categorised as "Investment - commercial property" (business classification L671230).
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 05 Feb 2014 to 06 Dec 2021
Address: 28b Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 12 Mar 2013 to 05 Feb 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 600
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 14 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 120 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Mushtaq Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036869381 |
Papanui Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
19 Jul 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 120 | |||
Director | Revis, Mark John |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
30 May 2013 - |
Individual | Pearce, Jedd |
Rd 1 Kaiapoi 7691 New Zealand |
30 May 2013 - |
Individual | Tait, Michelle Angela |
Saint Albans Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
30 May 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 120 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Siver Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037365417 |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2013 - |
Director | Stewart, Troy Francis |
Cracroft Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2013 - |
Individual | Stewart, Carleena |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 120 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Tigermal Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042228288 |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
08 Sep 2016 - |
Director | Costeloe, Frederick Michael Jeremy |
Mount Pleasant Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
30 May 2013 - |
Individual | Costeloe, Wendy Jane |
Mount Pleasant Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
30 May 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #5 Number of Shares: 120 | |||
Individual | Stewart, Carleena |
Halswell Christchurch 8025 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2013 - |
Director | Killick, Allan Edward |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2013 - |
Individual | Killick, Lianne |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Oakway Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037233242 Company Number: 1041059 |
30 May 2013 - 08 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Scul Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033776491 Company Number: 1881494 |
Papanui Christchurch Null New Zealand |
30 May 2013 - 19 Jul 2018 |
Entity | Taurus Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037233242 Company Number: 1041059 |
30 May 2013 - 08 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Taurus Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037233242 Company Number: 1041059 |
30 May 2013 - 08 Sep 2016 | |
Entity | Scul Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033776491 Company Number: 1881494 |
Papanui Christchurch Null New Zealand |
30 May 2013 - 19 Jul 2018 |
Allan Edward Killick - Director
Appointment date: 12 Mar 2013
Address: Strowan, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Feb 2018
Address: Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Feb 2017
Troy Francis Stewart - Director
Appointment date: 12 Mar 2013
Address: Cracroft, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Address used since 30 May 2013
Mark John Revis - Director
Appointment date: 27 May 2013
Address: Saint Albans, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Feb 2014
Paul Brown - Director
Appointment date: 27 May 2013
Address: Papanui, Christchurch, 8052 New Zealand
Address used since 27 May 2013
Frederick Michael Jeremy Costeloe - Director
Appointment date: 27 May 2013
Address: Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Oct 2016
Awuko Abrasives Limited
Level 1, 259 Lincoln Rd
Cancrete Group Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
People Puzzle Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
Savage Heat Exchangers Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
Cancrete Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
Ab Property Services Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
124 Central Limited
Level 1, 22 Foster Street
Basque Road 2013 Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
Guymon 2013 Limited
Level 3, 2 Hazeldean Road
Kilmore Orthopaedic Surgeons Limited
Level 3, 2 Hazeldean Road
Parchment Property Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue
The Shores 507 Limited
Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue