Skb Group Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 02 Apr 2013. 9429030287136 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Investment - residential property" (ANZSIC L671150) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Steven John Brown - an active director whose contract started on 02 Apr 2013,
Kirsty Louise Mcwilliam - an active director whose contract started on 02 Apr 2013,
Kirsty Louise Brown - an active director whose contract started on 02 Apr 2013.
Updated on 01 Sep 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 16 Greenwoods Close, Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 (types include: physical, registered).
Skb Group Limited had been using 31R Parker Avenue, New Lynn, Auckland as their physical address until 26 Feb 2020.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 1 share (1 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 99 shares (99 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 31r Parker Avenue, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 18 Feb 2019 to 26 Feb 2020
Address: 28 Customs Street East, Britomart, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Feb 2018 to 18 Feb 2019
Address: 73 La Rosa Street, Green Bay, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Mar 2014 to 26 Feb 2018
Address: Level 6, East On Quay, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Apr 2013 to 06 Mar 2014
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 06 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Mcwilliam, Kirsty Louise |
New Lynn Auckland 0600 New Zealand |
08 Mar 2023 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Director | Brown, Steven John |
Titirangi Auckland 0604 New Zealand |
02 Apr 2013 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Brown, Kirsty Louise |
Titirangi Auckland 0604 New Zealand |
08 Dec 2015 - 08 Mar 2023 |
Director | Brown, Kirsty Loiuse |
Green Bay Auckland 0604 New Zealand |
02 Apr 2013 - 08 Dec 2015 |
Steven John Brown - Director
Appointment date: 02 Apr 2013
Address: Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2018
Address: Green Bay, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Apr 2013
Address: New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2018
Kirsty Louise Mcwilliam - Director
Appointment date: 02 Apr 2013
Address: New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Mar 2023
Kirsty Louise Brown - Director
Appointment date: 02 Apr 2013
Address: Titirangi, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Feb 2021
Address: Green Bay, Auckland, 0604 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Apr 2013
Address: New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Feb 2018
Grooming Lounge Limited
Suite 304, Customs Street
Maxum Data Limited
Level 1
Brady Legacy Corporate Trustee Limited
28 Customs Street East
Harvest Integrated Research Organization New Zealand Limited
L1, The Levy Building
Proactis Southeast Asia Limited
Australis Nathan Building
Gateway Homes Limited
Australis Nathan Building
Balmer Holdings Limited
28 Customs Street
Froggatt Investments Limited
28 Customs Street East
Jbk Properties Limited
28 Customs Street East
Pathway Limited
28 Customs Street
Ricarah Limited
28 Customs Street
Tpd Investments Limited
28 Customs Street