C & C Roofing Limited was incorporated on 08 Oct 2013 and issued an NZ business number of 9429030030015. The registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Thomas William Leckie - an active director whose contract started on 11 Aug 2017,
Phillip Andrew Cornish - an active director whose contract started on 11 Aug 2017,
Lynda Joy Leckie - an active director whose contract started on 11 Aug 2017,
Gary Cornish - an inactive director whose contract started on 08 Oct 2013 and was terminated on 15 Aug 2017.
As stated in our database (last updated on 30 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: Flat 1, 87 Lonsdale Street, New Brighton, Christchurch, 8083 (types include: service, registered).
Up to 08 May 2018, C & C Roofing Limited had been using 5 Sturrocks Road, Redwood, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 3 shares are allocated to 3 groups (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Cornish, Phillip Andrew (a director) located at Sydenham, Christchurch postcode 8023.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 33.33 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Leckie, Thomas William - located at Cashmere, Christchurch.
The next share allotment (1 share, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Leckie, Lynda Joy, located at Rd 4, Hamilton (a director). C & C Roofing Limited is categorised as "Roof tiling" (business classification E322320).
Other active addresses
Address #4: Flat 1, 87 Lonsdale Street, New Brighton, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Service address used from 13 May 2024
Principal place of activity
Flat 2, 6 Landsdowne Terrace, Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 5 Sturrocks Road, Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 08 Oct 2013 to 08 May 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 3
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 04 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Cornish, Phillip Andrew |
Sydenham Christchurch 8023 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Leckie, Thomas William |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Leckie, Lynda Joy |
Rd 4 Hamilton 3284 New Zealand |
15 Aug 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Cornish, Gary |
Redwood Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2013 - 15 Aug 2017 |
Director | Gary Cornish |
Redwood Christchurch 8051 New Zealand |
08 Oct 2013 - 15 Aug 2017 |
Thomas William Leckie - Director
Appointment date: 11 Aug 2017
Address: New Brighton, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 01 May 2024
Address: Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2018
Address: Phillipstown, Christchurch, 8062 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2017
Phillip Andrew Cornish - Director
Appointment date: 11 Aug 2017
Address: Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Nov 2020
Address: Sydenham, Christchurch, 8023 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2019
Address: Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2017
Lynda Joy Leckie - Director
Appointment date: 11 Aug 2017
Address: Islington, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2023
Address: Rd 4, Hamilton, 3284 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2019
Address: Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Aug 2017
Address: Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Apr 2018
Gary Cornish - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Oct 2013
Termination date: 15 Aug 2017
Address: Redwood, Christchurch, 8051 New Zealand
Pukapuka Community Trust Of Canterbury
6 Sturrocks Road
Marist Harewood Cricket Club Incorporated
17a Sturrocks Road
Polepole Limited
9 Rossiter Avenue
People For People/tangata Mo Tangata Limited
20 Saunders Place
Qara Engineering And Trading Limited
9 Barnes Road
Kyle & Angel Limited
33 Munro Street
Bespoke Flooring Limited
11 Cowper Place
East Coast Metal Tile Roofing Limited
62 Langdons Road
Enable Grow Limited
251 Styx Mill Road
Meriton Limited
29 E Hamilton Avenue
United Roofing Limited
20 Hollyford Avenue
Weathermaster Roofing Canterbury Limited
119 Blenheim Road