Hbu Investments Limited, a registered company, was started on 12 May 2017. 9429046130204 is the business number it was issued. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is how the company was categorised. This company has been supervised by 3 directors: Benjamin Michael Jones - an active director whose contract started on 12 May 2017,
Robyn Mary Garner - an active director whose contract started on 02 Apr 2022,
Michael Geoffrey Garner - an inactive director whose contract started on 11 Sep 2017 and was terminated on 10 Mar 2022.
Last updated on 29 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 36 Ambrose Lane, Whitford, Auckland, 2571 (type: physical, registered).
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 99 shares (99%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1%).
Principal place of activity
20 Chisbury Tce, Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 27 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Garner Family Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048478632 |
Shelly Park Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
09 Oct 2020 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Jones, Benjamin Michael |
Rd 1 Howick 2571 New Zealand |
12 May 2017 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | Garner Family Trust | 11 Sep 2017 - 11 Sep 2017 | |
Individual | Garner, Michael Geoffrey |
Shelly Park, Manukau Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
11 Sep 2017 - 09 Oct 2020 |
Individual | Botica, Steven James |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
11 Sep 2017 - 09 Oct 2020 |
Individual | Garner, Robyn Mary |
Shelly Park Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
11 Sep 2017 - 09 Oct 2020 |
Benjamin Michael Jones - Director
Appointment date: 12 May 2017
Address: Rd 1, Howick, 2571 New Zealand
Address used since 12 May 2017
Robyn Mary Garner - Director
Appointment date: 02 Apr 2022
Address: Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Apr 2022
Michael Geoffrey Garner - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Sep 2017
Termination date: 10 Mar 2022
Address: Shelly Park, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 11 Sep 2017
Damha Tax Limited
28 Ambrose Lane
Allan Tee Medical Services Limited
16 Griggs Road
Industrial Electrics Limited
1 Ambrose Lane
Pd Woodard Limited
5 Griggs Rd
Woodhawk Limited
5 Griggs Rd
Wainono Investments Limited
37 Griggs Road
Fairfield Cottage Limited
134 Wades Road
Mrm Holdings Limited
57 Mission Heights Drive
Omega Lifestyles Limited
51 Chateau Rise
Pd Woodard Limited
5 Griggs Rd
Rose Care Trustee Limited
239 Jeffs Road
Woodhawk Limited
5 Griggs Rd