Cabjaks Assembly Limited was registered on 16 Dec 2016 and issued an NZBN of 9429045866395. The registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: Jason Mark Shaw - an active director whose contract started on 16 Dec 2016,
Hamish Milne Wilkie - an active director whose contract started on 07 Aug 2020,
Derek Anthony Heard - an active director whose contract started on 15 Nov 2023.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 20 Aug 2024), this company filed 1 address: Flat 2, 144 Third Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, service).
Up to 24 Aug 2020, Cabjaks Assembly Limited had been using 12 Bethlehem Road, Bethlehem, Tauranga as their physical address.
A total of 10000 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 10000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Cabjaks Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga, Tauranga postcode 3110. Cabjaks Assembly Limited is categorised as "Cabinet making, joinery - furniture" (business classification C251130).
Principal place of activity
Flat 2, 144 Third Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 12 Bethlehem Road, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 22 Nov 2017 to 24 Aug 2020
Address #2: 12 Bethlehem Road, Bethlehem, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 16 Dec 2016 to 22 Nov 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 25 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Cabjaks Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049154436 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
08 Apr 2024 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Clegg, Rachel Sarah |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Clegg, Rachel Sarah |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Wilkie, Ruwani Prasanthi |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2020 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Wilkie, Ruwani Prasanthi |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2020 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Wilkie, Ruwani Prasanthi |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2020 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Clegg, Rachel Sarah |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Clegg, Rachel Sarah |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Clegg, Rachel Sarah |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Entity | New Zealand Family Trust Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047415614 Company Number: 7425117 |
Addington Christchurch 8024 New Zealand |
22 Nov 2023 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Director | Shaw, Jason Mark |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Director | Shaw, Jason Mark |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Director | Shaw, Jason Mark |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Director | Shaw, Jason Mark |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Director | Shaw, Jason Mark |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Wilkie, Hamish Milnie |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2020 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Wilkie, Hamish Milnie |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2020 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Wilkie, Hamish Milnie |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2020 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Entity | Dominion Law Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034551677 Company Number: 1692043 |
Kingsland Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Entity | Dominion Law Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034551677 Company Number: 1692043 |
Kingsland Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Entity | Dominion Law Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034551677 Company Number: 1692043 |
Kingsland Auckland 1021 New Zealand |
16 Dec 2016 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Heard, Derek Anthony |
Eastern Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
22 Nov 2023 - 08 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Waidyaratna, Kulasiri Hemachandra |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
14 Aug 2020 - 15 Nov 2022 |
Jason Mark Shaw - Director
Appointment date: 16 Dec 2016
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Dec 2016
Hamish Milne Wilkie - Director
Appointment date: 07 Aug 2020
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Aug 2020
Derek Anthony Heard - Director
Appointment date: 15 Nov 2023
Address: Eastern Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Nov 2023
Bethlehem Pottery Club Incorporated
13 Bethlehem Road
Tony Han Optometrists Limited
7 Bethlehem Rd
Bexenterry Limited
6 Cherry Way
Total Chiropractic Limited
16 Bethlehem Road
Albert St Property Limited
Bethlehem Shopping Centre
Guang Zhou Bai Yun Limited
J10a Bethlethem Town Center
Black Label Builders Limited
299 Cameron Rd
Cabin Fever Limited
11 Derby Way
Eclipse Interiors Limited
9 Holmburn Street
Mastercraft Bop Limited
55 Eighth Avenue
Thomo & Coach Limited
10 Meadowland Street
Unity Holdings Limited
8 Glencarron Place