Inlet Estate Limited, a registered company, was launched on 06 Dec 2016. 9429043390786 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Residential property operation and development (excluding site construction)" (ANZSIC L671180) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been supervised by 4 directors: Rewi Hamid Bugo - an active director whose contract began on 06 Dec 2016,
Alisha Rewi Bugo - an active director whose contract began on 28 Aug 2023,
Keith Raymond Day - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Oct 2017 and was terminated on 28 Aug 2023,
Mahmood Khan - an inactive director whose contract began on 06 Dec 2016 and was terminated on 12 Oct 2017.
Updated on 17 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 404B Kapiro Road, Kerikeri, New Zealand, 0294 (type: service, registered).
Inlet Estate Limited had been using 13 Homestead Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri as their physical address until 11 Mar 2021.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 20 shares (20%) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50%). Lastly the third share allocation (30 shares 30%) made up of 1 entity.
Other active addresses
Address #4: 404b Kapiro Road, Kerikeri, New Zealand, 0294 New Zealand
Registered address used from 27 May 2024
Address #5: 404b Kapiro Road, Kerikeri, New Zealand, 0294 New Zealand
Service address used from 06 Aug 2024
Previous addresses
Address #1: 13 Homestead Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Physical address used from 19 Jul 2019 to 11 Mar 2021
Address #2: 13 Homestead Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Registered address used from 21 Jun 2019 to 01 Apr 2021
Address #3: Level 1, 5 Maraenui Drive, Kerikeri, 0293 New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Jan 2019 to 21 Jun 2019
Address #4: Level 1, 5 Maraenui Drive, Kerikeri, 0293 New Zealand
Physical address used from 29 Jan 2019 to 19 Jul 2019
Address #5: 368a Kerikeri Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 15 Sep 2017 to 29 Jan 2019
Address #6: 108 Kerikeri Road, Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Dec 2016 to 15 Sep 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 07 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 20 | |||
Director | Bugo, Rewi Hamid |
93200 Kuching Sarawak Malaysia |
06 Dec 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Bugo, Hamid |
Petra Jaya 93050 Kuching Sarawak Malaysia |
06 Dec 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 30 | |||
Other (Other) | Long White Cloud Investments Trust |
2 Blue Penguin Drive Kerikeri 0294 New Zealand |
06 Dec 2016 - |
Rewi Hamid Bugo - Director
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2016
Address: 93200 Kuching, Sarawak, Malaysia
Address used since 06 Dec 2016
Alisha Rewi Bugo - Director
Appointment date: 28 Aug 2023
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Aug 2023
Keith Raymond Day - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Oct 2017
Termination date: 28 Aug 2023
Address: Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Apr 2021
Address: Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Oct 2017
Address: Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Aug 2019
Mahmood Khan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Dec 2016
Termination date: 12 Oct 2017
Address: Kerikeri, Kerikeri, 0230 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Dec 2016
Camino Limited
368a Kerikeri Road
North Build (2015) Limited
368a Kerikeri Road
Bell Construction Limited
389 Kerikeri Road
Designer Jewellery New Zealand Limited
394b Kerikeri Road
Oryx Technologies Limited
394b Kerikeri Road
Optimum Services Limited
394b Kerikeri Road
D & G Property Holdings Limited
22 Kendall Road
Jack Sprat Limited
9 Akeake Road
Kerikeri Heights Limited
22 Kendall Road
Ladder Up Limited
10 Fairway Drive
Monarch Property Ventures Limited
15 Oakridge Drive
Te Rapa Developments Limited
10 Fairway Drive