Hts (Butler) Limited, a registered company, was started on 18 Aug 2016. 9429042521457 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is how the company is categorised. The company has been run by 8 directors: Angela Annette Marie Kershaw - an active director whose contract started on 18 Aug 2016,
Brian Norman Carter - an active director whose contract started on 18 Aug 2016,
Judith Lorraine Wilson - an active director whose contract started on 24 Sep 2017,
Lisa Maria Ebbers - an active director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2022,
Michael Peter O'hagan - an active director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2022.
Updated on 08 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 71 Mcalister Street, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 (types include: registered, physical).
Hts (Butler) Limited had been using Niederer Plaza, The Strand,, Whakatane as their registered address up to 17 Oct 2019.
A total of 60 shares are issued to 5 shareholders (4 groups). The first group is comprised of 15 shares (25%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 15 shares (25%). Finally the 3rd share allocation (15 shares 25%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous address
Address: Niederer Plaza, The Strand,, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 18 Aug 2016 to 17 Oct 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 60
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 20 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 15 | |||
Director | O'hagan, Michael Peter |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
20 Oct 2023 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 15 | |||
Director | Kershaw, Angela Annette Marie |
Ohope Ohope 3121 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2016 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 15 | |||
Individual | Wilson, Judith Lorraine |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
26 Sep 2017 - |
Shares Allocation #4 Number of Shares: 15 | |||
Director | Stephen Richard Franklin |
Ohope Ohope 3121 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2016 - |
Individual | Franklin, Stephen Richard |
Ohope Ohope 3121 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Carter, Brian Norman |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2016 - 20 Oct 2023 |
Individual | Jones, William Hugh |
Ohope Ohope 3121 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2016 - 26 Sep 2017 |
Director | William Hugh Jones |
Ohope Ohope 3121 New Zealand |
18 Aug 2016 - 26 Sep 2017 |
Angela Annette Marie Kershaw - Director
Appointment date: 18 Aug 2016
Address: Ohope, Ohope, 3121 New Zealand
Address used since 24 May 2017
Address: Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Aug 2016
Brian Norman Carter - Director
Appointment date: 18 Aug 2016
Address: Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Aug 2016
Judith Lorraine Wilson - Director
Appointment date: 24 Sep 2017
Address: Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Dec 2018
Address: Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Sep 2017
Lisa Maria Ebbers - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2022
Address: Rd 1, Taneatua, 3191 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2022
Michael Peter O'hagan - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2022
Address: Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2022
Steven John Stebbings - Director
Appointment date: 17 Jun 2022
Address: Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jun 2022
William Hugh Jones - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Aug 2016
Termination date: 24 Sep 2017
Address: Ohope, Ohope, 3121 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Aug 2016
Stephen Richard Franklin - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 18 Aug 2016
Termination date: 24 Sep 2017
Address: Ohope, Ohope, 3121 New Zealand
Address used since 18 Aug 2016
1026 Clas Trustees Limited
1026 Victoria Street
1026 Trustees (mehrtens) Limited
1026 Victoria Street
1026 Trustees Four Limited
1026 Victoria Street
1026 Trustees One Limited
1026 Victoria Street
1026 Trustees Three Limited
1026 Victoria Street
1026 Trustees Two Limited
1026 Victoria Street