Rg Limited was started on 10 Aug 2016 and issued a number of 9429042505921. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 1 director, named Richard Gilbert - an active director whose contract started on 10 Aug 2016.
As stated in our database (last updated on 16 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 4A 51 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (types include: office, service).
Up until 26 Apr 2023, Rg Limited had been using Suite 7, 31 Northcroft Street, Takapuna, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are allotted to 2 groups (3 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 990 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Harvey, Wayne Francis (an individual) located at Mangakakahi, Rotorua postcode 3015,
Gilbert, Richard (a director) located at Takapuna, Auckland postcode 0622.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 1% shares (exactly 10 shares) and includes
Gilbert, Richard - located at Takapuna, Auckland. Rg Limited is classified as "Internet advertising service" (business classification M694040).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 4a 51 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Office address used from 30 May 2023
Principal place of activity
16 Byron Avenue, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Suite 7, 31 Northcroft Street, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 29 Apr 2020 to 26 Apr 2023
Address #2: Unit 1, 16 Byron Avenue, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Apr 2018 to 29 Apr 2020
Address #3: Flat 3, 82a Landscape Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 10 Aug 2016 to 12 Apr 2018
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 12 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 990 | |||
Individual | Harvey, Wayne Francis |
Mangakakahi Rotorua 3015 New Zealand |
16 Jun 2021 - |
Director | Gilbert, Richard |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
02 Jun 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Director | Gilbert, Richard |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 New Zealand |
02 Jun 2021 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Other | The Opm Business Trust |
Chatswood Auckland 0626 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2021 - 16 Jun 2021 |
Director | Gilbert, Richard |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 New Zealand |
10 Aug 2016 - 30 Mar 2021 |
Other | The Opm Business Trust |
Chatswood Auckland 0626 New Zealand |
16 Mar 2021 - 16 Jun 2021 |
Richard Gilbert - Director
Appointment date: 10 Aug 2016
Address: Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 New Zealand
Address used since 06 May 2019
Address: Rotorua, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Nov 2016
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 22 May 2017
Cognito Software Limited
16 Bryon Ave
Aotearoa Art Academy Limited
18 Byron Avenue
Games R Us Limited
9 Byron Avenue
Hummingbird Media Limited
Como Street
Knoben Limited
1st Floor
Newco Construction (2013) Limited
1st Floor, 2 Burns Avenue
Back To Leau Limited
2nd Floor
Eva Creative Limited
437 Lake Road
H Enterprises Limited
159 Hurstmere Road
My Wedding Guide Limited
Level 1, 71 Barrys Point Road
Niche Directories Limited
Level 1, 71 Barrys Point Road
Work4me Limited
Ground Floor, 9 Anzac Street