36 Degrees Services Limited, a registered company, was started on 14 Apr 2016. 9429042298946 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Boat building or repair (all vessels under 50 tonnes displacement)" (business classification C239210) is how the company is categorised. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Conrad William Gair - an active director whose contract started on 26 Mar 2021,
Blair Scott Mcnaughton - an inactive director whose contract started on 14 Apr 2016 and was terminated on 26 Mar 2021.
Last updated on 29 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company registered, specifically: 103/113 Westhaven Drive, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (registered address),
103/113 Westhaven Drive, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (service address),
Suite 9, 1 Westhaven Drive, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (physical address).
36 Degrees Services Limited had been using Suite 9, 1 Westhaven Drive, Auckland Central, Auckland as their registered address up until 30 Jul 2024.
A single entity controls all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - 36 Degrees Brokers Limited - located at 1010, Auckland Central, Auckland.
Previous address
Address #1: Suite 9, 1 Westhaven Drive, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 14 Apr 2016 to 30 Jul 2024
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 22 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | 36 Degrees Brokers Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041258965 |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
14 Apr 2016 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mcnaughton, Blair Scott |
Devonport Auckland 0624 New Zealand |
14 Apr 2016 - 04 Aug 2022 |
Conrad William Gair - Director
Appointment date: 26 Mar 2021
Address: Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Mar 2021
Blair Scott Mcnaughton - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 14 Apr 2016
Termination date: 26 Mar 2021
Address: Devonport, Auckland, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Apr 2016
A C Bilham Limited
12 Landsdale Place
A J Rankin Boat Builders Limited
17 Torlesse Street
Aaron Marine Limited
72b Levers Road
Above & Below Marine Limited
8 Glendhu Road
Active Marine Services Limited
2/12 Wernham Place
Akatarawa Enterprises Limited
2021 Akatarawa Road