Nolybab Trustees Limited was registered on 02 Nov 2015 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042048558. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Michael Bruce Coutts - an active director whose contract started on 02 Nov 2015,
Gillian Marie Holden - an inactive director whose contract started on 02 Nov 2015 and was terminated on 01 Dec 2015.
As stated in BizDb's data (last updated on 26 Jul 2024), the company registered 1 address: 3B Delta Avenue, New Lynn, Auckland, 0600 (types include: physical, service).
Up until 21 Oct 2022, Nolybab Trustees Limited had been using 3049 Great North Road, New Lynn, Waitakere as their physical address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Coutts, Michael Bruce (a director) located at West Harbour, Auckland postcode 0618. Nolybab Trustees Limited was categorised as "Trustee service" (business classification K641965).
Previous addresses
Address: 3049 Great North Road, New Lynn, Waitakere, 0600 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Oct 2017 to 21 Oct 2022
Address: 3049 Great North Road, New Lynn, Waitakere, 0600 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Nov 2015 to 13 Oct 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 31 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Coutts, Michael Bruce |
West Harbour Auckland 0618 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Holden, Gillian Marie |
Glen Eden Auckland 0602 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2015 - 23 Dec 2015 |
Director | Gillian Marie Holden |
Glen Eden Auckland 0602 New Zealand |
02 Nov 2015 - 23 Dec 2015 |
Michael Bruce Coutts - Director
Appointment date: 02 Nov 2015
Address: West Harbour, Auckland, 0618 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Nov 2015
Gillian Marie Holden - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Nov 2015
Termination date: 01 Dec 2015
Address: Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Nov 2015
The Davy Group Limited
3049 Great North Road
J S Builders Limited
3049 Great North Road
Works Holding Company Limited
3049 Great North Road
Counties Plastics Limited
Offices Of Gnr Accountants Ltd
Black Powder Limited
First Floor, 3061 Great North Road
De,bree Hairdressing Limited
First Floor, 3061 Great North Road
Clark Ncr Trustees Limited
3049 Great North Road
Fiable Trustee Limited
28 Delta Avenue
Fleming Ncr Trustees Limited
3049 Great North Road
G Almond Family Trustees Limited
3049 Great North Road
Rainforest Trustee Limited
Level 3
Tin Tiger Trustees Limited
3049 Great North Road