Sage Management Services Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 09 Apr 2015. 9429041691748 is the NZBN it was issued. "Internet consultancy service" (business classification M700030) is how the company was classified. This company has been run by 2 directors: Sandun Anushka Ranasinghe - an active director whose contract started on 09 Apr 2015,
Rushain Joy Fernando - an inactive director whose contract started on 20 Jun 2022 and was terminated on 08 Sep 2022.
Last updated on 20 Aug 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 1 address: Flat 2, 13 Pine Terrace, Howick, Auckland, 2014 (type: registered, physical).
Sage Management Services Limited had been using 16 Fay Close, Wiri, Auckland as their registered address up to 04 Jul 2022.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 10 shares (10 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 90 shares (90 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 16 Fay Close, Wiri, Auckland, 2104 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 25 Jul 2019 to 04 Jul 2022
Address: 2/6, Leonard Road, Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Apr 2015 to 25 Jul 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 05 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Director | Ranasinghe, Sandun Anushka |
Pine Terrece, Howick Auckland 2104 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 90 | |||
Director | Ranasinghe, Sandun Anushka |
Pine Terrece, Howick Auckland 2104 New Zealand |
09 Apr 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Fernando, Rushain Joy |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 New Zealand |
06 Jul 2022 - 08 Sep 2022 |
Sandun Anushka Ranasinghe - Director
Appointment date: 09 Apr 2015
Address: Howick, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2023
Address: Wiri, Auckland, 2104 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Jul 2019
Address: Mt Wellington, Auckland, 1060 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jul 2016
Rushain Joy Fernando - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Jun 2022
Termination date: 08 Sep 2022
Address: Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jun 2022
Fayo Limited
10 Leonard Road
H&p Fashion (2014) Limited
51 Panorama Road
East City Bmx Club Incorporated
20 Lavas Place
09 Roofing Limited
62a Panorama Road
Jaffettes Dragon Boat Club Incorporated
62a Panorama Road
Contract It Limited
20 Panorama Road
Egroup Limited
232 Penrose Road
It Planet (nz) Limited
2-146 Penrose Road
Ko-de Limited
47 Boakes Rd
Onmark It Solutions Limited
4/322 Ellerslie-panmure Highway
Upon Limited
13a Harris Road
Wenzhou Limited
213 Main Highway