Danish Furniture Limited was started on 24 Nov 2014 and issued an NZBN of 9429041506509. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 3 directors: Karin Copestake - an active director whose contract started on 24 Nov 2014,
Andrew Craig Copestake - an active director whose contract started on 24 Nov 2014,
Drew Copestake - an active director whose contract started on 24 Nov 2014.
According to BizDb's information (updated on 28 Jul 2024), this company registered 2 addresses: 85 Sutherland Road, Brookfield, Tauranga, 3110 (registered address),
53 Unutoto Place, Tauriko, Tauranga, 3110 (physical address),
53 Unutoto Place, Tauriko, Tauranga, 3110 (service address).
Up to 08 Mar 2021, Danish Furniture Limited had been using 85 Sutherland Road, Brookfield, Tauranga as their registered address.
BizDb identified past names used by this company: from 08 Mar 2018 to 17 Mar 2020 they were called Dk Agile Holdings Limited, from 15 Jun 2017 to 08 Mar 2018 they were called Defy Clothing Limited and from 09 Aug 2016 to 15 Jun 2017 they were called Agile Tourism Ventures Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 50 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Copestake, Drew (a director) located at Brookfield, Tauranga postcode 3110.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50% shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Copestake, Karin - located at Brookfield, Tauranga. Danish Furniture Limited was categorised as "Management services nec" (ANZSIC M696297).
Previous addresses
Address #1: 85 Sutherland Road, Brookfield, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 21 Apr 2015 to 08 Mar 2021
Address #2: 79 Jonathon Street, Brookfield, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Nov 2014 to 21 Apr 2015
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 19 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Director | Copestake, Drew |
Brookfield Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
05 Oct 2022 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Copestake, Karin |
Brookfield Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
24 Nov 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Copestake, Andrew Craig |
Brookfield Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
24 Nov 2014 - 05 Oct 2022 |
Karin Copestake - Director
Appointment date: 24 Nov 2014
Address: Brookfield, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2015
Andrew Craig Copestake - Director
Appointment date: 24 Nov 2014
Address: Brookfield, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Apr 2015
Drew Copestake - Director
Appointment date: 24 Nov 2014
Address: Brookfield, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Apr 2015
Kowhai Educational Solutions Limited
114 Sutherland Road
Sanctuary Of Grace Church Trust
118a Sutherland Road
Mccarthy Books Limited
72a Sutherland Road
Carnachan Architecture & Planning Limited
120 Sutherland Road
Timsue Limited
124 Sutherland Road
Schollum Design Limited
61 Sutherland Road
Dynamic Earthworks Limited
95 Devonport Road
Manulife Investment Management Forest Management (nz) Limited
Unit 5, 120 Hamilton Street
Nz (bop) Investment & Development Limited
1011 Cameron Road
R & S Beale Limited
155 Fraser Street
Service Property Limited
30 Cameron Road
Willow Property Limited
69 Grace Road