Devi Mountain Limited was incorporated on 03 Oct 2014 and issued a number of 9429041440094. This registered LTD company has been run by 1 director, named Anurag Rasela - an active director whose contract started on 03 Oct 2014.
According to our database (updated on 22 Jul 2024), this company registered 1 address: 201 Murphys Road, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 (category: physical, registered).
Up until 30 Jan 2018, Devi Mountain Limited had been using 18 Fusion Road, Flat Bush, Auckland as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 3 groups (5 shareholders in total). As far as the first group is concerned, 998 shares are held by 3 entities, namely:
Rasela, Anurag (a director) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2016,
Rasela, Vandana (an individual) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2016,
Vihak Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2016.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 0.1 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Rasela, Anurag - located at Flat Bush, Auckland.
The 3rd share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Rasela, Vandana, located at Flat Bush, Auckland (an individual). Devi Mountain Limited has been classified as "Residential property operation and development (excluding site construction)" (ANZSIC L671180).
Previous addresses
Address: 18 Fusion Road, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 31 May 2017 to 30 Jan 2018
Address: 15 Chateau Rise, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 Oct 2014 to 31 May 2017
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 04 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 998 | |||
Director | Rasela, Anurag |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
03 Oct 2014 - |
Individual | Rasela, Vandana |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
03 Oct 2014 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Vihak Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049175462 |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
17 Jun 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Rasela, Anurag |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
03 Oct 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Rasela, Vandana |
Flat Bush Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
03 Oct 2014 - |
Anurag Rasela - Director
Appointment date: 03 Oct 2014
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Oct 2014
Devi President Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devrat Trustees Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi Kindergarten Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi Group Of Companies Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi Omana Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi Motatau Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi Group Of Companies Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi Kindergarten Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi Motatau Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi Omana Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi President Limited
201 Murphys Road
Devi Regent Limited
201 Murphys Road