Sampleco Limited was registered on 28 Jan 2014 and issued an NZBN of 9429041063163. The registered LTD company has been managed by 2 directors: Lisa Maree Beuvink - an active director whose contract began on 28 Jan 2014,
Clinton Alexander Beuvink - an active director whose contract began on 29 Mar 2021.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 06 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: Level 1, 7 Owens Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, service).
Up to 18 Nov 2022, Sampleco Limited had been using 48 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 121212 shares are allotted to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 121211 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Beuvink, Lisa Maree (a director) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 0 per cent shares (exactly 1 share) and includes
Beuvink, Lisa Maree - located at Parnell, Auckland. Sampleco Limited is categorised as "Sample distribution service" (business classification M694060).
Previous address
Address #1: 48 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 28 Jan 2014 to 18 Nov 2022
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 121212
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 30 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 121211 | |||
Director | Beuvink, Lisa Maree |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
28 Jan 2014 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Director | Beuvink, Lisa Maree |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
28 Jan 2014 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Mcateer, Dianne Victoria |
Parnell Auckland 1052 New Zealand |
23 Mar 2015 - 21 Feb 2023 |
Individual | Biggar, Kevin William |
Remuera Auckland 1050 New Zealand |
23 Mar 2015 - 21 Feb 2023 |
Individual | Fuller, Ernest Percival |
Glendowie Auckland 1071 New Zealand |
28 Jan 2014 - 07 Aug 2017 |
Lisa Maree Beuvink - Director
Appointment date: 28 Jan 2014
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Jan 2014
Clinton Alexander Beuvink - Director
Appointment date: 29 Mar 2021
Address: Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Mar 2021
The Alpha Trust
52 Broadway
Zen E Nz Limited
56 Broadway
Lake Road Investments 2007 Limited
44 Broadway
Eventfinda New Zealand Limited
4 Leek Street
Eventfinda Limited
4 Leek Street
Scarlet Interiors Limited
8 Railway Street
Barstuff Limited
1/1 Porters Ave, Eden Terrace
Black Box Globe Limited
48 Broadway
Brandport International Limited
Level 5
Creative Field Marketing Nz Limited
Staples Rodway Ltd
Desalt Limited
12 Mccoll Street
Good Bag Limited
Suite 4.3, 30 St Benedicts Street