Phase Two Limited was launched on 28 Apr 1958 and issued a business number of 9429040702414. The registered LTD company has been run by 4 directors: Jan Denise Cook - an active director whose contract started on 23 Apr 2015,
Paul Jeremy Cook - an inactive director whose contract started on 25 Nov 1985 and was terminated on 24 Apr 2015,
Eric A Cook - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Apr 1986 and was terminated on 05 Nov 2001,
June Cook - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Apr 1986 and was terminated on 24 May 2001.
According to BizDb's information (last updated on 25 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 201 Bleakhouse Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 (type: registered, service).
Until 10 Jul 2013, Phase Two Limited had been using 160 Marua Road, Ellerslie as their physical address.
BizDb identified old names for this company: from 28 Apr 1958 to 30 Sep 2015 they were named E A Cook Limited.
A total of 236200 shares are allocated to 1 group (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 236200 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Cook, James Alfred (an individual) located at Mellons Bay, Auckland postcode 2014,
Cook, Jan Denise (a director) located at Mellons Bay, Auckland postcode 2014.
Principal place of activity
160 Marua Road, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1051 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 160 Marua Road, Ellerslie New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Jul 1997 to 10 Jul 2013
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 236200
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 30 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 236200 | |||
Individual | Cook, James Alfred |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
03 Sep 2015 - |
Director | Cook, Jan Denise |
Mellons Bay Auckland 2014 New Zealand |
03 Sep 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Cook, Paul Jeremy |
Bucklands Beach Auckland 2012 New Zealand |
28 Apr 1958 - 03 Sep 2015 |
Jan Denise Cook - Director
Appointment date: 23 Apr 2015
Address: Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Sep 2020
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Apr 2015
Paul Jeremy Cook - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Nov 1985
Termination date: 24 Apr 2015
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jul 2013
Eric A Cook - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Apr 1986
Termination date: 05 Nov 2001
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland,
Address used since 21 Apr 1986
June Cook - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Apr 1986
Termination date: 24 May 2001
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland,
Address used since 21 Apr 1986
Certus Limited
161c Marua Road
Vanda Nz Limited
Unit G, 166 Marua Road
Ralph Spencer Limited
Unit G, 166 Marua Road
Vanda Holdings Limited
Unit G, 166 Marua Road
Supa Financial Services Limited
161d Marua Road
Spill Response (nz) Limited
175 Marua Road