Htwo Limited, a registered company, was registered on 01 Mar 1979. 9429040354675 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been managed by 5 directors: Barbara Ann Hesson - an active director whose contract began on 25 Sep 1991,
Neil Murray Hesson - an active director whose contract began on 25 Sep 1991,
Barabra Ann Hesson - an active director whose contract began on 25 Sep 1991,
Kevin John Bowry - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Sep 1991 and was terminated on 09 Jan 2004,
Deborah Jeannette Bowry - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Sep 1991 and was terminated on 09 Jan 2004.
Updated on 18 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 8 Wise Street, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 (types include: registered, physical).
Htwo Limited had been using 25 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch as their physical address up until 24 May 2019.
Previous names used by this company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 25 Jun 1998 to 01 Apr 2021 they were called Hesson and Bowry Collision Centre Limited, from 01 Mar 1979 to 25 Jun 1998 they were called Hesson & Bowry Panelbeating Limited.
A total of 10000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 1 share (0.01%) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 3 shareholders in control of 9998 shares (99.98%).
Previous addresses
Address: 25 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 16 May 2019 to 24 May 2019
Address: 8 Wise Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Jun 1997 to 16 May 2019
Address: Factory 2, 17 Wise St, Christchurch
Registered address used from 19 Aug 1994 to 19 Aug 1994
Address: 8 Wise Street, Christchurch New Zealand
Registered address used from 19 Aug 1994 to 16 May 2019
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10000
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 21 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Hesson, Barbara Ann |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2009 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 9998 | |||
Individual | Hesson, Brooke Alison Amber |
Rd 2 Kaiapoi 7692 New Zealand |
27 Aug 2019 - |
Individual | Hesson, Neil Murray |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2009 - |
Individual | Hesson, Barbara Ann |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
31 Jul 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Hesson, Neil Murray |
Christchurch |
01 Mar 1979 - 23 Jul 2004 |
Individual | Smith, Ngaire Joan |
Christchurch New Zealand |
31 Jul 2009 - 27 Aug 2019 |
Individual | Hesson, Barbara Anne |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
22 Aug 2008 - 26 May 2023 |
Individual | Hesson, Neil Murray |
Christchurch Christchurch 8083 New Zealand |
22 Aug 2008 - 22 Aug 2008 |
Individual | Hesson, Neil Murray |
Christchurch |
22 Aug 2008 - 22 Aug 2008 |
Individual | Bowry, Kevin John |
Christchurch |
01 Mar 1979 - 23 Jul 2004 |
Barbara Ann Hesson - Director
Appointment date: 25 Sep 1991
Address: Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 12 Jul 2022
Address: Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jul 2015
Neil Murray Hesson - Director
Appointment date: 25 Sep 1991
Address: Parklands, Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jul 2015
Barabra Ann Hesson - Director
Appointment date: 25 Sep 1991
Address: Christchurch, 8083 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Jul 2015
Kevin John Bowry - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Sep 1991
Termination date: 09 Jan 2004
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 25 Sep 1991
Deborah Jeannette Bowry - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Sep 1991
Termination date: 09 Jan 2004
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 25 Sep 1991
Costello Cars Limited
309 Lincoln Road
Hi Tech Sheet Metals Limited
9 Wise Street
Amy Graham Consulting Limited
9 Wise Street
Synthetic Oil (nz) Limited
313 Lincoln Road
Wayne Hill Motors Limited
313 Lincoln Road
K9 Natural Food Limited
305 Lincoln Road