Alan Hull Limited was incorporated on 05 Apr 1982 and issued a number of 9429040025575. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Teresa Ruth Hull - an active director whose contract began on 10 Feb 1988,
Alan Frederick Hull - an active director whose contract began on 10 Feb 1988.
According to our database (last updated on 18 Aug 2024), this company uses 5 addresess: 190 Postman Road, Rd 4, Albany, 0794 (office address),
190 Postman Road, Rd 4, Albany, 0794 (postal address),
190 Postman Road, Rd 4, Albany, 0794 (delivery address),
190 Postman Road, Rd4 Albany (other address) among others.
Up to 14 Aug 2005, Alan Hull Limited had been using 311 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland as their physical address.
A total of 2000 shares are issued to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 1000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Hull, Teresa Ruth (an individual) located at Albany, Auckland.
Then there is a group that consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 1000 shares) and includes
Hull, Alan Frederick - located at Albany, Auckland. Alan Hull Limited was categorised as "Painting of buildings or other structures" (business classification E324420).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 190 Postman Road, Rd 4, Albany, 0794 New Zealand
Postal & delivery address used from 21 Jul 2020
Principal place of activity
190 Postman Road, Rd 4, Albany, 0794 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 311 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland
Physical address used from 13 May 2002 to 14 Aug 2005
Address #2: 311 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland
Registered address used from 23 Apr 2002 to 14 Aug 2005
Address #3: 124 Symond St, Auckland
Registered address used from 10 Mar 1998 to 23 Apr 2002
Address #4: 124 Symond St, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Mar 1998 to 10 Mar 1998
Address #5: 151 Dominion Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Physical address used from 10 Mar 1998 to 13 May 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 2000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 03 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Hull, Teresa Ruth |
Albany Auckland |
05 Apr 1982 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Hull, Alan Frederick |
Albany Auckland |
05 Apr 1982 - |
Teresa Ruth Hull - Director
Appointment date: 10 Feb 1988
Address: Rd 4, Dairy Flat, 0794 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Aug 2020
Address: Albany, Auckland, 0794 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Jan 1993
Alan Frederick Hull - Director
Appointment date: 10 Feb 1988
Address: Rd 4, Dairy Flat, 0794 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Aug 2020
Address: Albany, Auckland, 0794 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Jan 1993
Johns Kitchenmakers (2010) Limited
240 Postman Road
Billett Investments Limited
240 Postman Road
Mobile Accounting Limited
159 Postmans Road
Extended Disc Australasia Limited
159 Postman Road
Hr Profiling Solutions Limited
159 Postman Road
Extended Disc Australasia 1999 Limited
159 Postman Road
Cheriton Decorators Limited
52 Gledstane Road
Diamond Roofing Limited
36 Kestrel Heights
Empire Group Limited
46 Timberland Drive
Intak Limited
2045
Leon Interior Limited
194 Wilks Rd
Wafer Painting Limited
110 Argent Lane