Intamusic Imports Limited was started on 01 Sep 1983 and issued an NZ business number of 9429039996527. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: James Dale Walker - an active director whose contract started on 01 Sep 1983,
Colleen Jessica Walker - an inactive director whose contract started on 08 Nov 1995 and was terminated on 28 Jun 2002,
Colleen Jessica Walker - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Sep 1983 and was terminated on 30 May 1994.
According to our database (last updated on 09 Sep 2024), this company registered 1 address: 240A Devonport Road, Tauranga, 3110 (type: postal, office).
Up to 22 Feb 2017, Intamusic Imports Limited had been using Charteredaccountants, 314 Maunganui Rd, Mount Maunganui as their registered address.
BizDb identified previous aliases for this company: from 10 Sep 1992 to 02 Sep 2008 they were called Jim's Music Room Limited, from 22 Aug 1991 to 10 Sep 1992 they were called The Music Room Limited and from 01 Sep 1983 to 22 Aug 1991 they were called Piccadilly Records Ltd.
A total of 5000 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 4999 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
G i Finlay Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Mount Maunganui postcode 3116. Intamusic Imports Limited has been categorised as "Painting of buildings or other structures" (business classification E324420).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 240a Devonport Road, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Postal address used from 05 Jun 2019
Address #5: Chartered Accountants,, 314 Maunganui Road, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 05 Jun 2019
Principal place of activity
240a Devonport Road, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Charteredaccountants, 314 Maunganui Rd, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 May 2011 to 22 Feb 2017
Address #2: Young Read Woudberg Ltd, 13 Mclean Street, Tauranga New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 26 May 2009 to 26 May 2011
Address #3: 49 Grey Street, Tauranga 3110
Physical & registered address used from 12 Sep 2008 to 26 May 2009
Address #4: 49 Grey Street, Tauranga
Physical address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 12 Sep 2008
Address #5: 76b Grey Street,, Tauranga
Registered address used from 20 Jan 1997 to 12 Sep 2008
Address #6: Shop 17, Piccadilly Arcade, Tauranga
Registered address used from 17 Sep 1991 to 20 Jan 1997
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 5000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 07 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 4999 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | G I Finlay Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038001093 |
Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
10 Oct 2023 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Walker, James Dale |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
01 Sep 1983 - 10 Oct 2023 |
Individual | Walker, James Dale |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
01 Sep 1983 - 10 Oct 2023 |
Entity | Yrw Trustees 2009 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032426069 Company Number: 2202359 |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
30 Jun 2010 - 10 Oct 2023 |
Individual | Walker, James Dale |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
01 Sep 1983 - 10 Oct 2023 |
Individual | Walker, James Dale |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
01 Sep 1983 - 10 Oct 2023 |
Individual | Walker, James Dale |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
01 Sep 1983 - 10 Oct 2023 |
Entity | G I Finlay Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038001093 Company Number: 875399 |
01 Sep 1983 - 30 Jun 2010 | |
Entity | G I Finlay Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038001093 Company Number: 875399 |
01 Sep 1983 - 30 Jun 2010 |
James Dale Walker - Director
Appointment date: 01 Sep 1983
Address: Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jun 2016
Colleen Jessica Walker - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Nov 1995
Termination date: 28 Jun 2002
Address: Oropi, Tauranga,
Address used since 08 Nov 1995
Colleen Jessica Walker - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Sep 1983
Termination date: 30 May 1994
Address: Oropi, Tauranga,
Address used since 01 Sep 1983
Zano Developments Limited
Chartered Accountants
Bostock Shelter Trimmers Limited
Chartered Accountants
Steel Frame Construction Limited
Chartered Accountants
Njd Trustees Limited
Chartered Accountants
Kelvin Peck Architecture Limited
Chartered Accountants
Knightlands Limited
Chartered Accountants
Advanced Painting Solutions Limited
17 Boronia Place
Barton Painting (2017) Limited
141 Cameron Road
Davis Ventures Limited
89 Fifth Avenue
His & Hers Painting & Decorating Limited
58 Wharf Street
Safari Painters (bay Of Plenty) Limited
10a Ranui Street
Santa Helena Enterprises Limited
15b Ngamotu Place