Bay Of Plenty Chiropractic Centre Limited, a registered company, was launched on 16 Dec 1987. 9429039500038 is the number it was issued. "Chiropractor service" (ANZSIC Q853410) is how the company is categorised. This company has been supervised by 2 directors: Elizabeth Margaret Dive - an active director whose contract started on 06 May 1991,
Quentin Leicester Dive - an active director whose contract started on 06 May 1991.
Updated on 26 Jun 2019, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 23 Myres Street, Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 (types include: physical, registered).
Bay Of Plenty Chiropractic Centre Limited had been using 23 Myres Street, Otumoetai, Tauranga as their physical address until 06 Jan 2017.
Old names used by this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 16 Dec 1987 to 26 Jun 1990 they were named Advance Horse Care Limited.
A total of 500 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group is comprised of 1 share (0.2 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (0.2 per cent). Lastly we have the third share allotment (498 shares 99.6 per cent) made up of 3 entities.
Previous addresses
Address: 23 Myres Street, Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 29 Sep 2014 to 06 Jan 2017
Address: 23 Myres Street, Tauranga New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Oct 2009 to 29 Sep 2014
Address: 2/42 Tay Street, Moun Maunganui
Physical address used from 20 Oct 2008 to 20 Oct 2008
Address: 2/42 Tay Street, Mount Maunganui
Registered address used from 20 Oct 2008 to 12 Oct 2009
Address: 26 Sunset Crescent, Maungatapu, Tauranga
Registered address used from 13 Sep 1999 to 20 Oct 2008
Address: 26 Sunset Crescent, Maungatapu, Tauranga
Physical address used from 17 Apr 1997 to 17 Apr 1997
Address: 60 Boscabel Drive, Ohauiti, R D 3, Tauranga
Physical address used from 17 Apr 1997 to 20 Oct 2008
Address: 204 Devonport Road, Tauranga
Registered address used from 15 Apr 1997 to 13 Sep 1999
Address: C/o Williams Associates, 38 Roma Road, Mt Roskill, Auckland
Registered address used from 18 Feb 1993 to 15 Apr 1997
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 500
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 08 Feb 2019
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Elizabeth Margaret Dive |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
16 Dec 1987 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Quentin Leicester Dive |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
16 Dec 1987 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 498 | |||
Individual | Elizabeth Margaret Dive |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
16 Dec 1987 - |
Individual | Quentin Leicester Dive |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 New Zealand |
16 Dec 1987 - |
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Tutbury Trustees (2008) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032916034 |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
10 Sep 2010 - |
Elizabeth Margaret Dive - Director
Appointment date: 06 May 1991
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2017
Quentin Leicester Dive - Director
Appointment date: 06 May 1991
Address: Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116 New Zealand
Address used since 07 Sep 2017
Reform Limited
33 Myres Street
Yeovil Investments Limited
41 Myres Street
Plumbing Fix Limited
49 Myres Street
Erigra Investments Limited
177 Pillans Road
Mctavish-huriwai Investments Limited
52 Goods Road
Mb2 Limited
39 Goods Road
Action Potential Chiropractic Limited
Cronin Cullen Egan
Atlas World Health Clinic Limited
141 Cameron Road
Jbt Healthcare Limited
5 Rauhea Street
Mount Mc Limited
Cronin Cullen Egan
Spine Limited
Kpmg
Te Puke Mc Limited
30 Cameron Road