Wood'search Marketing Limited, a registered company, was started on 17 Apr 1991. 9429039112897 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Forestry and logging - management and consulting services" (ANZSIC M696230) is how the company was categorised. The company has been run by 2 directors: Angus John Mcpherson - an active director whose contract began on 17 Apr 1991,
Christine Mary O'connor - an active director whose contract began on 17 Apr 1991.
Updated on 16 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 5837, Dunedin, 9054 (types include: postal, office).
Wood'search Marketing Limited had been using 16 Constitution Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin 9016 as their registered address up to 02 Aug 2013.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 500 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 500 shares (50 per cent).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 35 Erin Street, Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Office & delivery address used from 16 Jul 2019
Principal place of activity
35 Erin Street, Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 16 Constitution Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin 9016 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 04 Aug 2009 to 02 Aug 2013
Address #2: 16 Constitution Street, City Rise, Dunedin 9001
Physical & registered address used from 05 Apr 2005 to 04 Aug 2009
Address #3: 20a Laurie Avenue, Parnell, Auckland
Physical address used from 20 Aug 2002 to 05 Apr 2005
Address #4: 20a Laurie Avenue, Parnell, Auckland
Physical address used from 16 Aug 2002 to 20 Aug 2002
Address #5: 20 A Laurie Avenue, Parnell, Auckland 1001
Registered address used from 05 Jul 2002 to 05 Apr 2005
Address #6: 47 Sophia Street, Rotorua
Registered address used from 20 Apr 1998 to 05 Jul 2002
Address #7: 4th Floor, 253 Queen Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 20 Apr 1998 to 16 Aug 2002
Address #8: 47 Sophia Street, Rotorua
Physical address used from 20 Apr 1998 to 20 Apr 1998
Address #9: 1/23a Howard Street, Macandrew Bay, Dunedin
Registered address used from 09 Dec 1993 to 20 Apr 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 29 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | O'connor, Christine Mary |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
17 Apr 1991 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Mcpherson, Angus John |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 New Zealand |
17 Apr 1991 - |
Angus John Mcpherson - Director
Appointment date: 17 Apr 1991
Address: Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Jul 2013
Christine Mary O'connor - Director
Appointment date: 17 Apr 1991
Address: Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Jul 2013
The Balmacewen Tennis Club Incorporated
27 Erin Street
Otaki Holdings Limited
23 Erin Street
High Tide Dunedin Limited
23 Erin St
Mclibstein Limited
14 City Road
Mcoderings Limited
14 City Road
Gatekeeper Properties Limited
21a Erin Street
Dhl Asset Management Limited
15 Reeves Street
Forest Tech Limited
28 St Albans Street
H And H Farm Forestry Limited
6 Kereru Close
Keenan Forestry Limited
Level 3, 31 Stafford Street
Revolution Forest Management Limited
6 Shakespeare Street
Wtk Contracting Limited
120 Pukeuri-oamaru Road