Christchurch Retail Furniture Limited, a registered company, was started on 11 Aug 1992. 9429038947087 is the number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 4 directors: Paul Ferguson Macnicol - an active director whose contract began on 02 Dec 1994,
Eric Nicholaas Buisman - an inactive director whose contract began on 20 Jan 1995 and was terminated on 29 Jan 2000,
Fiona Jane Mount - an inactive director whose contract began on 11 Aug 1992 and was terminated on 02 Dec 1994,
Jan Miller - an inactive director whose contract began on 11 Aug 1992 and was terminated on 02 Dec 1994.
Updated on 02 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 28 Harbour View Road, Rd 6, Point Wells, 0986 (type: registered, service).
Christchurch Retail Furniture Limited had been using Greens Road, Matakana, Warkworth as their physical address until 08 Jan 2016.
Old names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 11 Aug 1992 to 27 Feb 1996 they were named Paloma Holdings Limited.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 290000 shares) - Christchurch Retail Appliances Limited - located at 0986, Warkworth, Warkworth.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Greens Road, Matakana, Warkworth New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 03 Mar 2005 to 08 Jan 2016
Address #2: Offices Of Pierce/tubs, Level 3, 167 Vitoria Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 06 Nov 2000 to 03 Mar 2005
Address #3: Offices Of Pierce/tubbs, Level 3, 167 Vitoria Street, Christchurh
Physical address used from 19 May 2000 to 03 Mar 2005
Address #4: Macnicol & Co, Packers Building, Queen St, Warkworth
Registered address used from 19 May 2000 to 06 Nov 2000
Address #5: Macnicol & Co, Packers Building, Queen St, Warkworth
Physical address used from 19 May 2000 to 19 May 2000
Address #6: C/- Macnicol & Co, Suite 1a, Hallmark Building, Hillary Square, Orewa
Physical & registered address used from 11 Jan 2000 to 19 May 2000
Address #7: C/- Law Corporation (nz) Limited, 76 Anzac Avenue, Auckland
Registered address used from 01 Sep 1992 to 11 Jan 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 290000
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 07 Nov 2016
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 290000 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Christchurch Retail Appliances Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038399206 |
Warkworth Warkworth 0910 New Zealand |
11 Aug 1992 - |
Paul Ferguson Macnicol - Director
Appointment date: 02 Dec 1994
Address: Rd 6, Point Wells, 0986 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Jul 2024
Address: Warkworth, Warkworth, 0910 New Zealand
Address used since 22 Dec 2015
Eric Nicholaas Buisman - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Jan 1995
Termination date: 29 Jan 2000
Address: Christchurch,
Address used since 20 Jan 1995
Fiona Jane Mount - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Aug 1992
Termination date: 02 Dec 1994
Address: Grafton, Auckland,
Address used since 11 Aug 1992
Jan Miller - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 11 Aug 1992
Termination date: 02 Dec 1994
Address: Onehunga, Auckland,
Address used since 11 Aug 1992
Turvey Company Limited
5 Lilburn Street
Omaha Beach Residents Society Incorporated
C/o Macnicol & Co Ltd
Flying Flea Trustee Co Limited
4 Lilburn Street
Consulting Associates Limited
39
Agm Construction Limited
19 Bertram Street
Imago Aotearoa Charitable Trust Board
21 Bertram Street