Suzy Aiken Enterprises Limited, a registered company, was launched on 28 Jul 1993. 9429038825132 is the number it was issued. This company has been run by 1 director, named Suzanne Elizabeth Clarkson - an active director whose contract started on 28 Jul 1993.
Last updated on 20 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: 6 Edenvale Park Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (category: registered, physical).
Suzy Aiken Enterprises Limited had been using 81 Selwyn Avenue, Greenlane, Auckland as their registered address up to 06 Oct 2021.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Clarkson, Suzanne Elizabeth - located at 1024, Mt Eden, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: 81 Selwyn Avenue, Greenlane, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Jul 2019 to 06 Oct 2021
Address: 139 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 May 2016 to 10 Jul 2019
Address: 139 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1050 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Jul 2012 to 30 May 2016
Address: Campbell Forbes, Chartered Accountants, 182 Great South Rd, Remuera, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 02 Jul 2004 to 06 Jul 2012
Address: 5th Floor, Union House, 32 Quay Street, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 01 Jul 1997 to 02 Jul 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 08 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Clarkson, Suzanne Elizabeth |
Mt Eden Auckland New Zealand |
25 Jun 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Burns, John William Boswell |
Greenlane Auckland |
28 Jul 1993 - 24 May 2006 |
Individual | Aiken, Suzanne Elizabeth |
Ponsonby Auckland |
25 Jun 2004 - 25 Jun 2004 |
Suzanne Elizabeth Clarkson - Director
Appointment date: 28 Jul 1993
Address: Mt Eden, Auckland, New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jun 2004
Stone Strong Australia Pty Limited
139 Great South Road
Modern Law Trustee Services Limited
139 Great South Road
C.i.p (nz) Limited
139 Great South Road
The Duck Pond Limited
139 Great South Road
Ofek Technologies Limited
139 Great South Road
Yu & Zhou Investments Limited
139 Great South Road