Newzealandhunting.com Limited was started on 05 Nov 1993 and issued a number of 9429038713583. The registered LTD company has been managed by 3 directors: Danielle Anita Wilson - an active director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2015,
Phillip Boyd Wilson - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 Nov 1993 and was terminated on 31 Jul 2015,
Pauline Marilyn Wilson - an inactive director whose contract started on 05 Nov 1993 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2015.
According to our database (last updated on 25 Jul 2024), this company registered 1 address: 803 Opihi Road, Rd12, Pleasant Point, 7982 (types include: registered, physical).
Up to 03 Oct 2018, Newzealandhunting.com Limited had been using 330 Sawyers Arms Road, Bishopdale, Christchurch as their physical address.
BizDb identified previous aliases for this company: from 05 Nov 1993 to 05 Aug 2015 they were named Exclusive Wilderness Safaris Limited.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 1000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Wilson, Danielle Anita (an individual) located at Rd 12, Totara Valley postcode 7982.
Previous addresses
Address: 330 Sawyers Arms Road, Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 09 Jul 2013 to 03 Oct 2018
Address: 6 Ennerdale Row, Westmorland, Christchurch 8025 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Jun 2010 to 09 Jul 2013
Address: 6 Ennerdale Row, Westmoreland, Christchurch
Registered address used from 12 Jan 1998 to 04 Jun 2010
Address: 25 Glenora Place, Christchurch
Physical address used from 08 Jan 1998 to 08 Jan 1998
Address: 25 Glenora Place, Christchurch 8004
Registered address used from 08 Jan 1998 to 12 Jan 1998
Address: 6 Ennerdale Row, Westmorland, Christchurch
Physical address used from 08 Jan 1998 to 04 Jun 2010
Address: Ager Riley & Cocks, Accountants, 84 Gloucester Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 30 Jun 1994 to 08 Jan 1998
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: June
Annual return last filed: 28 Jun 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Wilson, Danielle Anita |
Rd 12 Totara Valley 7982 New Zealand |
07 Jul 2015 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Wilson, Pauline Marilyn |
Bishopdale Christchurch 8053 New Zealand |
05 Nov 1993 - 07 Jul 2015 |
Individual | Wilson, Phillip Boyd |
Bishopdale Christchurch 8053 New Zealand |
05 Nov 1993 - 07 Jul 2015 |
Danielle Anita Wilson - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2015
Address: Pleasant Point, Totara Valley, 7982 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Oct 2018
Address: Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2015
Phillip Boyd Wilson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Nov 1993
Termination date: 31 Jul 2015
Address: Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2013
Pauline Marilyn Wilson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 05 Nov 1993
Termination date: 31 Mar 2015
Address: Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2013
Shj Group Limited
332 Sawyers Arms Road
Oceaneast Limited
324a Sawyers Arms Road
Emmanuel Proprietor Trust
322 Sawyers Arms Road
Shuker & Morris Limited
348 Sawyers Arms Road
Shadbolt Engineering Limited
352 Sawyers Arms Road
Study Programs Abroad Limited
106 Gardiners Road