Katian Holdings Limited, a registered company, was launched on 17 Oct 1994. 9429038583711 is the business number it was issued. "House renting or leasing - except holiday house" (business classification L671140) is how the company is categorised. This company has been run by 3 directors: Ian William David Christensen - an active director whose contract started on 17 Oct 1994,
Katrina C. - an inactive director whose contract started on 17 Oct 1994 and was terminated on 23 Jun 2023,
Joan Katherine Christensen - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Nov 2015 and was terminated on 19 Feb 2022.
Last updated on 03 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 5 addresses the company uses, specifically: 65 Church Street, Masterton, 5810 (registered address),
65 Church Street, Masterton, 5810 (service address),
172 High Street, Solway, Masterton, 5810 (registered address),
172 High Street, Solway, Masterton, 5810 (physical address) among others.
Katian Holdings Limited had been using 5 Spenser Road, Enderley, Hamilton as their registered address until 28 Feb 2022.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 98 shares (98 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1 per cent).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 172 High Street, Solway, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Registered & physical & service address used from 28 Feb 2022
Address #5: 65 Church Street, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 05 Mar 2024
Principal place of activity
5 Spenser Road, Enderley, Hamilton, 3214 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 5 Spenser Road, Enderley, Hamilton, 3214 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 28 Feb 2018 to 28 Feb 2022
Address #2: 5 Matipo Street, Lansdowne, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Mar 2014 to 28 Feb 2018
Address #3: 24c Mcdonald Crescent, Ellerslie, Auckland 1060 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Apr 2010 to 05 Mar 2014
Address #4: 1 Oakley Avenue, Marton
Physical & registered address used from 07 Feb 2006 to 08 Apr 2010
Address #5: 70 Nelson Street, Howick, Auckland 1705
Registered & physical address used from 07 Mar 2003 to 07 Feb 2006
Address #6: 1 Oakley Avenue, Marton
Physical address used from 29 Feb 2000 to 07 Mar 2003
Address #7: Stretton & Co, Towngate Building, 44 Heu Heu Street, Taupo
Registered address used from 29 Feb 2000 to 07 Mar 2003
Address #8: Stretton & Co, Towngate Bldg, 44 Heu Heu Street, Taupo
Physical address used from 29 Feb 2000 to 29 Feb 2000
Address #9: Kpmg Peat Marwick, 11th Floor, Peat Marwick Tower, 85 Alexandra Street, Hamiton
Physical address used from 23 Mar 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
Address #10: 31 Amanda Avenue, Dinsdale, Hamilton
Registered address used from 08 May 1996 to 29 Feb 2000
Address #11: Kpmg Peat Marwick, 11th Floor, Peat Marwick Tower, 85 Alexandra Street, Hamilton
Registered address used from 21 Jul 1995 to 08 May 1996
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 26 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Other (Other) | Ian Christensen |
Masterton 5810 New Zealand |
28 Feb 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Christensen, Ian William David |
Masterton 5810 New Zealand |
17 Oct 1994 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Christensen, Katrina Elizabeth | 17 Oct 1994 - 30 Oct 2023 |
Ian William David Christensen - Director
Appointment date: 17 Oct 1994
Address: Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Address used since 26 Feb 2024
Address: Solway, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Feb 2022
Katrina C. - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 17 Oct 1994
Termination date: 23 Jun 2023
Joan Katherine Christensen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Nov 2015
Termination date: 19 Feb 2022
Address: Lansdowne, Masterton, 5810 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Nov 2015
Nhb Nz Limited
95a Fifth Avenue
Vaishali Holdings Limited
97 Fifth Avenue
Waterwitch Management Limited
66 Enderley Avenue
Shinjokai Karate-do Incorporated
8 Shelley Court
Hairplay Limited
38 Fifth Avenue
Kawana Morehu International Foundation Nz Usa London Charitable Trust
25 A Enderley Avenue
Carter Real Estate Limited
15 Woodstock Road
Ellie Property Holdings Limited
20a Piako Road
Ono P Limited
C/-hemi Edwards Bartels Limited
Opoia Trustees Limited
27b Opoia Road
Vier Von Uns Limited
12 Ada Place
Zesd Enterprises Limited
3 Hardley St