Oswald Builders Limited, a registered company, was started on 02 Apr 1996. 9429038500251 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 3 directors: Robert Neil Oswald - an active director whose contract started on 02 Apr 1996,
Beverley June Oswald - an active director whose contract started on 04 Feb 2009,
Beverley June Oswald - an inactive director whose contract started on 02 Apr 1996 and was terminated on 26 Jul 1996.
Updated on 04 Aug 2021, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 2 addresses this company uses, specifically: 10 Baigent Place, Tanners Point, Rd 1, Katikati, 3177 (physical address),
10 Baigent Place, Tanners Point, Katikati (registered address).
Oswald Builders Limited had been using Ingham Mora Limited, 10 Baigent Place, Tanners Point, Katikati as their physical address up until 25 Feb 2008.
One entity controls all company shares (exactly 24 shares) - Htt 2007 Limited - located at 3177, Tauranga, Tauranga.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Ingham Mora Limited, 10 Baigent Place, Tanners Point, Katikati
Physical address used from 25 Feb 2008 to 25 Feb 2008
Address #2: 10 Baigent Place, Tanners Point, Katikati
Physical address used from 25 Feb 2008 to 12 Feb 2009
Address #3: Young Oswald Accountants Limited, 80 Main Road, Katikati
Physical address used from 06 Mar 2006 to 25 Feb 2008
Address #4: C/o Young Oswald Associates, Chartered Accountants, 80 Main Road, Katikati
Physical address used from 05 Mar 2001 to 06 Mar 2006
Address #5: 10 Baigent Place, Tanners Point, Katikati
Physical address used from 05 Mar 2001 to 05 Mar 2001
Address #6: 10 Baigent Place, Tanners Point, Katikati
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 12 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 14 Feb 2021
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 24 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Htt 2007 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033661711 |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
04 Feb 2009 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Beverley June Oswald |
Katikati |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 |
Individual | Beverley June Oswald |
Tanners Point R D 1, Katikati New Zealand |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 |
Individual | Robert Neil Oswald |
Katikati |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 |
Entity | Young Oswald Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037383756 Company Number: 1011462 |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 | |
Individual | Robert Neil Oswald |
Tanners Point R D 1, Katikati New Zealand |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 |
Entity | Young Oswald Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037383756 Company Number: 1011462 |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 | |
Individual | Robert Neil Oswald |
Tanners Point R D 1, Katikati New Zealand |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 |
Individual | Robert Neil Oswald |
Tanners Point R D 1, Katikati New Zealand |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 |
Individual | Beverley June Oswald |
Tanners Point R D 1, Katikati New Zealand |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 |
Individual | Beverley June Oswald |
Tanners Point R D 1, Katikati New Zealand |
02 Apr 1996 - 30 May 2005 |
Robert Neil Oswald - Director
Appointment date: 02 Apr 1996
Address: Tanners Point, Katikati, 3177 New Zealand
Address used since 02 Apr 1996
Beverley June Oswald - Director
Appointment date: 04 Feb 2009
Address: Tanners Point, R D 1, Katikati, 3177 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Feb 2009
Beverley June Oswald - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Apr 1996
Termination date: 26 Jul 1996
Address: Tanners Point, Katikati,
Address used since 02 Apr 1996
Turama Ahi Pottery Limited
240 Tanners Point Road
The Tanners Point Residents And Ratepayers Association Incorporated
169a Tanners Point Road
Cb Homes Limited
7 Moana Drive
The Katikati Funfest Charitable Trust Board
7 Moana Drive