Qbik i P Management Limited was launched on 21 Nov 1996 and issued an NZ business number of 9429038190773. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 4 directors: Adrien De Croy - an active director whose contract started on 05 Mar 1997,
Craig Andrew Gower - an active director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2001,
Christopher Crawford Barrow - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Apr 1997 and was terminated on 01 Apr 2001,
Lisa Maree Tauber - an inactive director whose contract started on 21 Nov 1996 and was terminated on 05 Mar 1997.
As stated in BizDb's database (updated on 16 Sep 2024), this company uses 1 address: Bdo Auckland, Level 4, 4 Graham Street, Auckland, 1140 (type: registered, physical).
Up to 09 Jan 2017, Qbik i P Management Limited had been using Bdo Auckland, Level 8, 120 Albert Street, Auckland as their registered address.
BizDb found old names used by this company: from 21 Nov 1996 to 05 Mar 1997 they were called Edenvale Holdings Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 1 group (2 shareholders in total). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 2 entities, namely:
Gower, Craig (an individual) located at Milford, Auckland postcode 0620,
De Croy, Adrien (an individual) located at Epsom, Auckland.
Previous addresses
Address: Bdo Auckland, Level 8, 120 Albert Street, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Apr 2014 to 09 Jan 2017
Address: 96a Kitchener Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 24 Mar 2014 to 14 Apr 2014
Address: Bdo Auckland, Level 8, 120 Albert Street, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 May 2010 to 24 Mar 2014
Address: Bdo Spicers, Level 8, 120 Albert Street, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 29 Oct 2003 to 05 May 2010
Address: B.d.o Spicers, Lvl 8, Westpactrust Tower, 120 Albert St, Auckland
Physical address used from 12 Oct 2001 to 12 Oct 2001
Address: B.d.o Spicers, Lvl 8, Westpactrust Tower, 120 Albert St, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Oct 2001 to 29 Oct 2003
Address: Bdo Spicers, Level 18, Westpactrust Tower, 120 Albert St, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 12 Oct 2001 to 12 Oct 2001
Address: 13th Floor, Quay Tower, 29 Customs Street West, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 14 Sep 2001 to 12 Oct 2001
Address: 3e/406 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 14 Sep 2001
Address: 10 Hepburn Street, Ponsonby, Auckland
Physical address used from 17 Dec 1997 to 14 Sep 2001
Address: 10 Hepburn Street, Ponsonby, Auckland
Registered address used from 17 Dec 1997 to 11 Apr 2000
Address: 3e/406 Remuera Road, Remuera, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 25 Mar 1997 to 17 Dec 1997
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 29 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Gower, Craig |
Milford Auckland 0620 New Zealand |
21 Nov 1996 - |
Individual | De Croy, Adrien |
Epsom Auckland New Zealand |
21 Nov 1996 - |
Adrien De Croy - Director
Appointment date: 05 Mar 1997
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Oct 2008
Craig Andrew Gower - Director
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2001
Address: Milford, Auckland, 0620 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Apr 2016
Christopher Crawford Barrow - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Apr 1997
Termination date: 01 Apr 2001
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland,
Address used since 21 Apr 1997
Lisa Maree Tauber - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 21 Nov 1996
Termination date: 05 Mar 1997
Address: Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 21 Nov 1996
The Warehouse Limited
Level 4
Airport Dental Services Limited
Level 4
Jack And Jessica Developments Trustee Co Limited
Level 4
Stockholm Trustee Company Limited
Level 4
Philip Beattie Medical Services Limited
Level 4
Wainui Sixteen Limited
Level 4