Du Val Properties Limited, a registered company, was started on 23 Jun 1997. 9429038061257 is the NZBN it was issued. "Building, residential - renting or leasing - other than holiday" (ANZSIC L671120) is how the company is categorised. This company has been run by 2 directors: Llewelyn Phillip Du Val - an active director whose contract began on 23 Jun 1997,
Murray Ian Withers - an inactive director whose contract began on 23 Jun 1997 and was terminated on 22 Feb 2019.
Updated on 14 Sep 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 14 Mccormacks Bay Road, Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081 (types include: office, delivery).
Du Val Properties Limited had been using 1/20 Old Red Barn Rd, Halswell, Christchurch as their registered address up to 06 Dec 2016.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - Du Val, Llewelyn Phillip - located at 8081, Mount Pleasant, Christchurch.
Principal place of activity
14 Mccormacks Bay Road, Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1/20 Old Red Barn Rd, Halswell, Christchurch, 8025 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 29 Oct 2013 to 06 Dec 2016
Address #2: 53 Colenso Street, Sumner, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 06 Nov 2012 to 29 Oct 2013
Address #3: 2 Moncks Spur Road, Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 Sep 2011 to 06 Nov 2012
Address #4: Apt E2, 18 Carlton Mill Rd, Christchurch 8014 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 12 Oct 2006 to 20 Sep 2011
Address #5: Murray Withers & Associates, Worcester Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 04 Nov 2005 to 12 Oct 2006
Address #6: West Penthouse, 18 Carlton Mill Road, Christchurch
Registered address used from 04 Nov 2005 to 12 Oct 2006
Address #7: Papprill Hadfield & Aldous, 79-83 Hereford Street, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 09 Sep 2002 to 04 Nov 2005
Address #8: 211 Gloucester Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 11 Apr 2000 to 09 Sep 2002
Address #9: 211 Gloucester Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 24 Jun 1997 to 09 Sep 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 13 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Director | Du Val, Llewelyn Phillip |
Mount Pleasant Christchurch 8081 New Zealand |
22 Feb 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Du Val, Ernest Frederick Michael |
Christchurch |
23 Jun 1997 - 07 Sep 2022 |
Individual | Du Val, Ernest Frederick Michael |
Christchurch |
23 Jun 1997 - 07 Sep 2022 |
Individual | Withers, Murray Ian |
Christchurch 8011 New Zealand |
23 Jun 1997 - 22 Feb 2019 |
Llewelyn Phillip Du Val - Director
Appointment date: 23 Jun 1997
Address: Mount Pleasant, Christchurch, 8081 New Zealand
Address used since 24 Sep 2020
Address: Papanui, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Oct 2014
Murray Ian Withers - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 23 Jun 1997
Termination date: 22 Feb 2019
Address: Cashel Street, Christchurch, 8001 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Oct 2015
Mbr Group Limited
26 Mt Pleasant Road
Business Health & Safety Limited
26 Mt Pleasant Road
Mt Pleasant Memorial Community Centre & Residents' Association Incorporated
Community Centre
Avon-heathcote Estuary Ihutai Trust
3 Mccormacks Bay Road
Brock Engineering Limited
5 Tama Terrace
Brock Properties Limited
5 Tama Terrace
Ampersand Holdings Limited
622b Ferry Road
Chembala Investments Limited
Unit37, 105bamford Street
Cruise Away Investments Limited
238 Major Hornbrook Road
Fiona And Chris Rentals Two Limited
262 Cannon Hill Crescent
Major Hornbrook Limited
14 Luxton Place
On The Rock Property Limited
169b Rocking Horse Road