Aio Ca Limited, a registered company, was launched on 04 Nov 1998. 9429037743048 is the business number it was issued. "Mortgage broking service" (business classification K641930) is how the company was classified. The company has been run by 1 director, named John Felix Schumacher - an active director whose contract began on 04 Nov 1998.
Last updated on 08 Sep 2024, BizDb's data contains detailed information about 5 addresses this company registered, namely: 10 Newell Street, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 (postal address),
10 Newell Street, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 (office address),
10 Newell Street, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 (delivery address),
12 Greenpark Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 (registered address) among others.
Aio Ca Limited had been using 706 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland as their registered address until 10 Apr 2019.
Past names for this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 06 Apr 2004 to 27 Aug 2012 they were called All In One Finance (Central Auckland) Limited, from 04 Nov 1998 to 06 Apr 2004 they were called Samson Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 99 shares (99%) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1%).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 12 Greenpark Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Registered address used from 10 Apr 2019
Address #5: 10 Newell Street, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Postal & office & delivery address used from 05 Apr 2022
Principal place of activity
10 Newell Street, Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 706 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2016 to 10 Apr 2019
Address #2: 18c Aorere Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 01 Jun 2006 to 12 Apr 2016
Address #3: C/o John Norton, 32 Leys Cresent, Remuera, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 16 Jun 2004 to 01 Jun 2006
Address #4: C/o John Norton, 4 Mt Pleasant Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 09 Jan 2004 to 16 Jun 2004
Address #5: C/o John Norton, 81 Mcdonnell Road, Arrowtown
Registered & physical address used from 24 Apr 2002 to 09 Jan 2004
Address #6: 330 Dominion Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Physical address used from 26 Apr 2000 to 24 Apr 2002
Address #7: 327 Dominion Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Physical address used from 26 Apr 2000 to 26 Apr 2000
Address #8: 327 Dominion Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 24 Apr 2002
Address #9: 327 Dominion Road, Mt Eden, Auckland
Registered address used from 10 Apr 2000 to 12 Apr 2000
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 02 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Schumacher, John Felix |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
04 Nov 1998 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Anderson, Maxine Lynette |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 New Zealand |
04 Nov 1998 - |
John Felix Schumacher - Director
Appointment date: 04 Nov 1998
Address: Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 14 Apr 2021
Address: Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022 New Zealand
Address used since 05 Apr 2011
The Third Media Limited
Suite 3, 706 Great South Road
Rocket Payrolls Limited
4/706 Great South Road
United Communications Group Limited
Suite 3, 706 Great South Road
V Menu Limited
Suite 3, 706 Great South Road
Chameleon Customer Contact Pty Ltd
6/706 Great South Road
Remuera Motor Lodge Limited
Unit 2, 710 Great South Road
Chm Holdings Limited
642 Great South Road
David Wong Group Limited
69a Oranga Avenue
Ideal Financial Services Limited
Unit H, Building 3
Kingston Management Services Limited
704 Great South Road
Mortgage Consulting Limited
16 Wilkinson Road
Real Mortgages (nz) Limited
Level 1, Building 5, Central Park