Armstrong Construction Limited was registered on 17 May 1999 and issued an NZBN of 9429037601027. The registered LTD company has been managed by 1 director, named William Keith Armstrong - an active director whose contract started on 17 May 1999.
As stated in BizDb's information (last updated on 28 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: 3A Sunningvale Lane, Ilam, Christchurch, 8053 (types include: physical, registered).
Up to 23 Apr 2018, Armstrong Construction Limited had been using 158 Main South Road, Sockburn, Christchurch as their registered address.
A total of 1000 shares are allocated to 2 groups (2 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 500 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Armstrong, Bernice Mary (an individual) located at Ilam, Christchurch postcode 8053.
The 2nd group consists of 1 shareholder, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 500 shares) and includes
Armstrong, William Keith - located at Ilam, Christchurch. Armstrong Construction Limited has been categorised as "Building, residential - flats, home units, apartments, etc" (business classification E301910).
Principal place of activity
3a Sunningvale Lane, Ilam, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: 158 Main South Road, Sockburn, Christchurch, 8042 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Apr 2007 to 23 Apr 2018
Address: 47 Mandeville Street, Christchurch
Registered & physical address used from 15 Mar 2004 to 10 Apr 2007
Address: 118 Victoria Street, Christchurch
Physical & registered address used from 28 May 2002 to 15 Mar 2004
Address: First Floor, 52 Cashel Street, Christchurch
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 28 May 2002
Address: First Floor, 52 Cashel Street, Christchurch
Physical address used from 18 May 1999 to 28 May 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 01 Mar 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, Bernice Mary |
Ilam Christchurch 8053 New Zealand |
17 May 1999 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Armstrong, William Keith |
Ilam Christchurch 8053 New Zealand |
17 May 1999 - |
William Keith Armstrong - Director
Appointment date: 17 May 1999
Address: Ilam, Christchurch, 8053 New Zealand
Address used since 13 Apr 2018
Address: Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jul 2011
Greers Road Seafood Limited
38 Gleneagles Terrace
Can Seventeen Investments Limited
197 Clyde Road
Pegasus Medical Centre Limited
17a Wai-iti Terrace
Strack & Co Limited
17a Wai-iti Terrace
Windehn Holdings Limited
17a Wai-iti Terrace
Posh Porridge Limited
17a Wai-iti Terrace
Bam Property Holdings Limited
16a Hamilton Avenue
Hamish Ferguson Builders Limited
47b Hamilton Avenue
Jewell Builders Limited
236 Clyde Road
Knew Group 2015 Limited
Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House
Touchstone Homes Limited
16b Makora Street
Westminster Developments Limited
8 Plynlimon Road