Utrade Limited, a registered company, was registered on 07 May 1999. 9429037589752 is the number it was issued. This company has been managed by 1 director, named Michael Charles Hare - an active director whose contract started on 07 May 1999.
Updated on 20 Jul 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 2, 14 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, service).
Utrade Limited had been using Level 3 Mastercard House, 136 Customs Street West, Auckland as their physical address up until 19 Apr 2012.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 1 share (1%) held by 1 entity. Next we have the second group which includes 3 shareholders in control of 98 shares (98%). Lastly we have the 3rd share allocation (1 share 1%) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address #1: Level 3 Mastercard House, 136 Customs Street West, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 19 Apr 2011 to 19 Apr 2012
Address #2: C/-spencer Financial Partners Limited, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 Jun 2005 to 19 Apr 2011
Address #3: 225 Garnet Road, Westmere, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 30 Apr 2002 to 20 Jun 2005
Address #4: Lymington, R D 9, Feilding
Registered address used from 12 Apr 2000 to 30 Apr 2002
Address #5: Lymington, R D 9, Feilding
Physical address used from 07 May 1999 to 30 Apr 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 04 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Hare, Michael Charles |
Devonport North Shore City 0624 New Zealand |
07 May 1999 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 98 | |||
Individual | Spencer, Andrew James |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 New Zealand |
02 Apr 2008 - |
Individual | Hare, Michael Charles |
Devonport North Shore City 0624 New Zealand |
13 Jun 2005 - |
Individual | Hare, Angela Marie |
Devonport North Shore City 0624 New Zealand |
13 Jun 2005 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Hare, Angela Marie |
Devonport North Shore City 0624 New Zealand |
13 Jun 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Hare, Adrian Edmund |
Westmere Auckland |
13 Jun 2005 - 16 Mar 2006 |
Michael Charles Hare - Director
Appointment date: 07 May 1999
Address: Devonport, North Shore City, 0624 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Aug 2010
Fml Retail Limited
Level 6
Snapper Rock International Limited
Level 6
Cardinal Employee Share Scheme Limited
Level 6
Alturnsi Limited
Level 6
Fil Ventures Limited
Level 6
Sarsfield Trustee Limited
Level 6