Stockfeeders N.z. Limited, a registered company, was started on 03 Oct 2000. 9429037140434 is the number it was issued. "Commercial property lease/development" (business classification L671210) is how the company has been categorised. The company has been managed by 3 directors: Christopher Simon Oughton - an active director whose contract began on 03 Oct 2000,
Christopher Simeon Oughton - an active director whose contract began on 03 Oct 2000,
Everett Ralph Thorburn - an inactive director whose contract began on 03 Oct 2000 and was terminated on 29 Jun 2007.
Last updated on 03 Sep 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 13 Papakura-Clevedon Road, Rd 2, Papakura, 2582 (category: registered, physical).
Stockfeeders N.z. Limited had been using Head Road, Hunua, Rd3, Papkura as their registered address up until 13 Jun 2012.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 99 shares (99%) held by 2 entities. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1%).
Previous addresses
Address #1: Head Road, Hunua, Rd3, Papkura New Zealand
Registered address used from 23 May 2008 to 13 Jun 2012
Address #2: Hill Farm, 388 North Road, Clevedon, Rd 2, Papakura
Physical address used from 23 Jul 2004 to 23 May 2008
Address #3: Hill Farm, 388 North Road, Clevedon, Rd 2, Papakura
Registered address used from 23 Jul 2004 to 23 May 2008
Address #4: Gosling Chapman Limited, Level 6, 51-53 Shortland Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 18 Sep 2003 to 23 Jul 2004
Address #5: C/-gosling Chapman Limited, Level 8, 63 Albert Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 29 May 2003 to 18 Sep 2003
Address #6: Gosling Chapman, Level 8, 63 Albert Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 03 Oct 2000 to 03 Oct 2000
Address #7: C/-gosling Chapman Limited, Level 8, 63 Albert Street, Auckland
Physical address used from 03 Oct 2000 to 18 Sep 2003
Address #8: Gosling Chapman, Level 8, 63 Albert Street, Auckland
Registered address used from 03 Oct 2000 to 29 May 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 06 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Oughton, Brett |
Papakura 2580 New Zealand |
23 Aug 2021 - |
Individual | Oughton, Christopher Simon |
Rd 3 Papakura 2583 New Zealand |
03 Oct 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Oughton, Christopher Simon |
Rd 3 Papakura 2583 New Zealand |
06 Jul 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Thorburn, Phyliss Ann |
Maraetai Beach Auckland |
03 Oct 2000 - 06 Jul 2007 |
Individual | Thorburn, Everett Ralph |
Maraetai Beach Auckland |
03 Oct 2000 - 06 Jul 2007 |
Individual | Oughton, Valerie Dawn |
Dannemora Auckland 2016 New Zealand |
03 Oct 2000 - 23 Aug 2021 |
Entity | Mgh Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037975906 Company Number: 881134 |
03 Oct 2000 - 06 Jul 2007 | |
Entity | Mgh Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037975906 Company Number: 881134 |
03 Oct 2000 - 06 Jul 2007 | |
Individual | Oughton, Ronald Robert |
Half Moon Bay Pakuranga |
03 Oct 2000 - 06 Jul 2007 |
Christopher Simon Oughton - Director
Appointment date: 03 Oct 2000
Address: Rd 3, Papakura, 2583 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2011
Christopher Simeon Oughton - Director
Appointment date: 03 Oct 2000
Address: Rd 3, Papakura, 2583 New Zealand
Address used since 23 Jun 2011
Everett Ralph Thorburn - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 03 Oct 2000
Termination date: 29 Jun 2007
Address: R D 2, Papakura, Auckland,
Address used since 03 Oct 2000
Clevedon Village Liquor Centre Limited
14 Papakura-clevedon Road
Coast And Catchment Limited
27 Papakura-clevedon Road
Clevedon Medical Centre Limited
27 Papakura-clevedon Road
Clevedon Community Trust
St Andrews Presbyterian Church
Ibod Limited
1 Papakura-clevedon Road
Matt Bruce Auto Electrical Limited
22 Monument Road
Albert Rose Investments Limited
38 Wairere Road
C.v & P.t Sim Property Limited
5 Dromoland Drive
Lonica Holdings Limited
820 North Road
Sai Commercial Limited
28 Bellagio Way
Thompson's Limited
40 Grove Road
Whitham Investments Limited
41a Red Hill Road