Smicam Developments Limited was registered on 27 Sep 2000 and issued a number of 9429037125943. This registered LTD company has been managed by 4 directors: Hester Catharina Smith - an active director whose contract began on 27 Sep 2000,
Leon Wouter Smith - an inactive director whose contract began on 27 Sep 2000 and was terminated on 16 May 2010,
Jennifer Daphne Campbell - an inactive director whose contract began on 27 Sep 2000 and was terminated on 04 Jun 2009,
Robert Gordon Campbell - an inactive director whose contract began on 27 Sep 2000 and was terminated on 04 Jun 2009.
According to BizDb's database (updated on 19 Aug 2024), this company registered 1 address: 23 Manuwai Drive, Matua, Tauranga, 3110 (types include: physical, registered).
Until 17 Jun 2009, Smicam Developments Limited had been using 13 Owens Place, Mount Maunganui 3116 as their registered address.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 3 groups (4 shareholders in total). When considering the first group, 1 share is held by 1 entity, namely:
Grace Management Limited (an entity) located at Matua, Tauranga, Null.
The 2nd group consists of 2 shareholders, holds 50 per cent shares (exactly 50 shares) and includes
Smith, Hester Catharina - located at Matua, Tauranga 3110,
Smith, Wouter Alexander - located at Tauranga.
The next share allocation (49 shares, 49%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Smith, Hester Catharina, located at Matua, Tauranga 3110 (an individual). Smicam Developments Limited has been classified as "Commercial property lease/development" (ANZSIC L671210).
Principal place of activity
23 Manuwai Drive, Matua, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 13 Owens Place, Mount Maunganui 3116
Registered address used from 17 Jun 2009 to 17 Jun 2009
Address #2: 23 Manuwai Drive, Matua, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Registered address used from 17 Jun 2009 to 12 Jul 2010
Address #3: 23 Manuwai Drive, Matua, Tauranga, 3110
Physical address used from 17 Jun 2009 to 12 Jul 2010
Address #4: 13 Owens Place, Mt Maunganui 3116 New Zealand
Physical address used from 17 Jun 2009 to 17 Jun 2009
Address #5: 13 Owens Place, Mt Maunganui
Physical & registered address used from 27 Sep 2000 to 17 Jun 2009
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 27 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Grace Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037358211 |
Matua Tauranga Null New Zealand |
14 Sep 2010 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Smith, Hester Catharina |
Matua Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
27 Sep 2000 - |
Individual | Smith, Wouter Alexander |
Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
22 Feb 2013 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 49 | |||
Individual | Smith, Hester Catharina |
Matua Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
27 Sep 2000 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Smith, Hester Catharina |
Matua Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
10 Jun 2009 - 05 Jul 2010 |
Individual | Campbell, Jennifer Daphne |
Mt Maunganui |
27 Sep 2000 - 10 Jun 2009 |
Entity | Htt 2009 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032417838 Company Number: 2204121 |
14 Sep 2010 - 22 Feb 2013 | |
Entity | Htt 2009 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032417838 Company Number: 2204121 |
14 Sep 2010 - 22 Feb 2013 | |
Individual | Smith, Leon Wouter |
Matua Tauranga 3110 New Zealand |
27 Sep 2000 - 02 Jul 2010 |
Entity | Htt 2009 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032417838 Company Number: 2204121 |
10 Jun 2009 - 02 Jul 2010 | |
Individual | Campbell, Robert Gordon |
Mt Maunganui |
27 Sep 2000 - 10 Jun 2009 |
Entity | Htt 2009 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032417838 Company Number: 2204121 |
10 Jun 2009 - 02 Jul 2010 |
Hester Catharina Smith - Director
Appointment date: 27 Sep 2000
Address: Matua, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Jun 2009
Leon Wouter Smith - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Sep 2000
Termination date: 16 May 2010
Address: Matua, Tauranga, 3110 New Zealand
Address used since 10 Jun 2009
Jennifer Daphne Campbell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Sep 2000
Termination date: 04 Jun 2009
Address: Tauranga,
Address used since 25 Mar 2009
Robert Gordon Campbell - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Sep 2000
Termination date: 04 Jun 2009
Address: Tauranga,
Address used since 25 Mar 2009
Grace Management Limited
23 Manuwai Drive
Turketo Trust Limited
21 Manuwai Drive
Tauranga Surgical Group Limited
27 Manuwai Drive
International Caravanning Fellowship Of Rotarians New Zealand Incorporated
16 Manuwai Drive
Tabs Management Limited
8 Takahe Place
Kathy Chambers Consulting Limited
49 Eaton Crescent
2bob Investments Limited
52a Judea Road
Fraser142 Limited
4/14 Cypress Street
Gold Town Holdings Limited
Level 1, 247 Cameron Road
Goldtown Holdings No 1 Limited
Level 1, 247 Cameron Road
Hangar 4 Limited
6 Lemon Grove Avenue
Matai Investments Limited
Apartment 142, 112 Carmichael Road