New Media Promotions Limited, a registered company, was registered on 27 Nov 2000. 9429037066567 is the New Zealand Business Number it was issued. "Sign mfg - electric" (business classification C243240) is how the company is categorised. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Ian James Stewart - an active director whose contract began on 27 Nov 2000,
David Bart Van Dam - an inactive director whose contract began on 27 Nov 2000 and was terminated on 01 Dec 2003.
Last updated on 23 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 142 Kaipara Hills Road, Glorit, Warkworth, 0984 (category: registered, physical).
New Media Promotions Limited had been using Level 1, 445 Lake Road, Takapuna as their registered address up until 13 Jul 2015.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 99 shares (99 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which consists of 1 shareholder in control of 1 share (1 per cent).
Principal place of activity
142 Kaipara Hills Road, Glorit, Warkworth, 0984 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: Level 1, 445 Lake Road, Takapuna, 0622 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 05 Dec 2014 to 13 Jul 2015
Address: 142 Kaipara Hills Road, Rd 4, Warkworth, 0984 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 14 Apr 2014 to 05 Dec 2014
Address: 142 Kaipara Hills Rd, Glorit, Auckland, 0984 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 03 May 2013 to 14 Apr 2014
Address: 15 Sturdee St, Viaduct Basin, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 Mar 2004 to 03 May 2013
Address: 2 Hebe Place, Birkenhead, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 25 Mar 2002 to 22 Mar 2004
Address: 1 Vontempsky St, Hamilton
Registered & physical address used from 27 Nov 2000 to 25 Mar 2002
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: April
Annual return last filed: 16 Apr 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 99 | |||
Individual | Stewart, Ian James |
Glorit Warkworth 0984 New Zealand |
27 Nov 2000 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Stewart, Norma |
Rd 4 Warkworth 0984 New Zealand |
21 Mar 2019 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Velthuysen, Janet |
Parakai Parakai 0830 New Zealand |
24 Apr 2013 - 01 Jul 2014 |
Individual | Van Dam, David Bart |
Ponsonby Auckland |
27 Nov 2000 - 10 Feb 2005 |
Ian James Stewart - Director
Appointment date: 27 Nov 2000
Address: Rd 4, Warkworth, 0984 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2013
David Bart Van Dam - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Nov 2000
Termination date: 01 Dec 2003
Address: Ponsonby, Auckland,
Address used since 27 Nov 2000
4m + Funxion Limited
22a Parkway Drive
Airborne Signs Limited
15a Saturn Pl
Aisha Services Limited
100 Eskdale Road
Master Design Limited
9f Airborne Road
Sign Focus Limited
44 - 46 Constellation Drive
Signbiz Auckland Limited
30/427 Albany Highway