Thirteen Fifty Eight Investments Limited was started on 30 Jan 2001 and issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037021016. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 13 directors: Stewart James Edward - an active director whose contract started on 08 Dec 2016,
Michael John Mason Keefe - an active director whose contract started on 25 Nov 2022,
Tamati Gerald Coffey - an inactive director whose contract started on 08 Dec 2016 and was terminated on 21 Nov 2022,
Grahame Walter Hall - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2015 and was terminated on 08 Dec 2016,
Paul Clayton East - an inactive director whose contract started on 01 Apr 2015 and was terminated on 08 Dec 2016.
According to our data (last updated on 01 Aug 2024), the company registered 3 addresses: 1072 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, Rotorua, 3010 (physical address),
1072 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, Rotorua, 3010 (registered address),
1072 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, Rotorua, 3010 (service address),
1072 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, 3040 (office address) among others.
Up to 16 Feb 2022, Thirteen Fifty Eight Investments Limited had been using 1358 Eruera Street, Rotorua as their registered address.
BizDb identified other names used by the company: from 30 Jan 2001 to 28 Feb 2007 they were called Rect Investments Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). As far as the first group is concerned, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Rotoruatrust Perpetual Capital Fund Limited (an entity) located at Rotorua, Rotorua postcode 3010. Thirteen Fifty Eight Investments Limited is categorised as "Financial asset investing" (ANZSIC K624010).
Principal place of activity
1072 Haupapa Street, Rotorua, 3040 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1358 Eruera Street, Rotorua, 3040 New Zealand
Registered address used from 24 Feb 2017 to 16 Feb 2022
Address #2: 1358 Eruera Street, Rotorua New Zealand
Physical address used from 01 Feb 2005 to 16 Feb 2022
Address #3: 1358 Eruera Street, Rotorua New Zealand
Registered address used from 01 Feb 2005 to 24 Feb 2017
Address #4: 102 Eruera Street, Rotorua
Physical & registered address used from 30 Jan 2001 to 01 Feb 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 01 Mar 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Rotoruatrust Perpetual Capital Fund Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033570242 |
Rotorua Rotorua 3010 New Zealand |
02 Apr 2007 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Entity | Rect Funds Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036395163 Company Number: 1228496 |
16 Jun 2005 - 16 Jun 2005 | |
Entity | Rotorua Energy Charitable Trust Company Number: 700914 |
30 Jan 2001 - 16 Jun 2005 | |
Entity | Rotorua Energy Charitable Trust Company Number: 700914 |
30 Jan 2001 - 16 Jun 2005 | |
Entity | Rect Funds Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036395163 Company Number: 1228496 |
16 Jun 2005 - 16 Jun 2005 |
Ultimate Holding Company
Stewart James Edward - Director
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2016
Address: Kawaha Point, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Dec 2016
Michael John Mason Keefe - Director
Appointment date: 25 Nov 2022
Address: Springfield, Rotorua, 3015 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Nov 2022
Tamati Gerald Coffey - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2016
Termination date: 21 Nov 2022
Address: Kawaha Point, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Dec 2016
Grahame Walter Hall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2015
Termination date: 08 Dec 2016
Address: Lynmore, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2015
Paul Clayton East - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 01 Apr 2015
Termination date: 08 Dec 2016
Address: Glenholme, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2015
Peter John Halligan - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Feb 2008
Termination date: 31 Mar 2015
Address: Rotorua,
Address used since 22 Feb 2008
Stuart Bowden Burns - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jun 2005
Termination date: 28 Mar 2013
Address: Kawaha Point, Rotorua, 3010 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Jan 2010
Paul Clayton East - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Oct 2007
Termination date: 30 Sep 2012
Address: Rotorua,
Address used since 24 Oct 2007
Mark Alan Butcher - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 29 Jun 2005
Termination date: 24 Oct 2007
Address: Rotorua,
Address used since 16 Apr 2007
Judith Anne Keaney - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jan 2001
Termination date: 29 Jun 2005
Address: R D 1, Rotorua,
Address used since 30 Jan 2001
Grahame Walter Hall - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Nov 2004
Termination date: 29 Jun 2005
Address: Lynmore, Rotorua,
Address used since 26 Nov 2004
Roma Miringa Cook - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Sep 2002
Termination date: 26 Nov 2004
Address: Rotorua,
Address used since 01 Feb 2004
John Williams James Lepper - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Jan 2001
Termination date: 10 Sep 2002
Address: Rotorua,
Address used since 30 Jan 2001
Rotorua Energy Charitable Trust
1358 Eruera Street
Rotorua Heritage Trust
1358 Eruera Street
Rotorua Civic Arts Trust
C/o The Rotorua Energy Charitable Trust
Te Ara Ki Te Reo Ki Kuirau Charitable Trust
1351 Amohau Street
Te Arawa Federation Of Maori Authorities Incorporated
1/1378 Eruera Street
Age Concern Rotorua District Incorporated
1333 Eruera Street
Csl2014 Limited
C/-stuart Wilson & Associates Ltd
Iggy's Enterprises Limited
1301 Amohau Street
Kapenga M Trustee Company Limited
2 / 1176 Amohau Street
Pinfish Limited
1268 Arawa Street
Sod Investment Limited
1247 Ranolf Street
Wilshier Trustee's Limited
1301 Amohau Street