Hurakia Lodge Limited was started on 28 Jun 2001 and issued an NZ business number of 9429036864362. This registered LTD company has been run by 3 directors: John Macculloch - an active director whose contract began on 28 Jun 2001,
Ralph Stuettgen - an inactive director whose contract began on 28 Jun 2001 and was terminated on 28 Mar 2002,
Ian Lawrence - an inactive director whose contract began on 28 Jun 2001 and was terminated on 28 Mar 2002.
As stated in our database (updated on 25 Jul 2024), the company uses 5 addresess: 40 George Street, Kingsland, Auckland, 1024 (registered address),
40 George Street, Kingsland, Auckland, 1024 (service address),
40 George Street, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (registered address),
40 George Street, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (physical address) among others.
Until 12 Jul 2022, Hurakia Lodge Limited had been using 95 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland as their physical address.
BizDb identified former names for the company: from 09 Apr 2002 to 11 Jun 2004 they were called Pohutukawa Bay Lodge Limited, from 28 Jun 2001 to 09 Apr 2002 they were called A-Technologies Limited.
A total of 250000 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). When considering the first group, 250000 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Macculloch, John (an individual) located at Bellevue Hill, Sydney postcode 2023. Hurakia Lodge Limited is categorised as "Investment - commercial property" (ANZSIC L671230).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 40 George Street, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Registered & physical & service address used from 12 Jul 2022
Address #5: 40 George Street, Kingsland, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 12 Jul 2023
Principal place of activity
95 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 95 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 17 Jul 2017 to 12 Jul 2022
Address #2: 33 Selwyn Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 26 Jul 2012 to 17 Jul 2017
Address #3: 295b Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1150 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 02 Aug 2010 to 26 Jul 2012
Address #4: 295 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 13 Aug 2009 to 02 Aug 2010
Address #5: 16 Eastbourne Road, Remuera, Auckland
Registered address used from 31 Jul 2006 to 13 Aug 2009
Address #6: 60 Sandford Way, Rakino Island, Auckland, Huraki Gulf
Physical address used from 31 Jul 2006 to 13 Aug 2009
Address #7: 137 Captain Springs Road, Onehunga, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 28 Jun 2001 to 31 Jul 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 250000
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 04 Jul 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 250000 | |||
Individual | Macculloch, John |
Bellevue Hill Sydney 2023 Australia |
28 Jun 2001 - |
John Macculloch - Director
Appointment date: 28 Jun 2001
ASIC Name: Aluart Pty Limited
Address: Bellevue Hill, Sydney, 2023 Australia
Address used since 30 Jul 2015
Address: Sydney, 2023 Australia
Address: Bellevue Hill, Sydney, 2023 Australia
Address used since 29 Nov 2016
Ralph Stuettgen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Jun 2001
Termination date: 28 Mar 2002
Address: Mt Eden, Auckland,
Address used since 28 Jun 2001
Ian Lawrence - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 28 Jun 2001
Termination date: 28 Mar 2002
Address: Beachlands, Auckland,
Address used since 28 Jun 2001
Hoddle Trustee Company Limited
33 Selwyn Street
Spring And Autumn Trustees Limited
33 Selwyn Street
Carian Trustee Company Limited
33 Selwyn Street
M & M Waters Trustee Company Limited
33 Selwyn Street
Dkl Trustees No1 Limited
33 Selwyn Street
Philorth Trustees Limited
33 Selwyn Street
Blackrod Limited
Level 1, 270 Neilson Street
High Investment Limited
37 Church Street
Mystic Treasures Limited
49 Neilson Street
National Assets Control Limited
75h Hill Street
Rochdale Bond Properties Limited
329b Onehunga Mall
Star Box Investments Limited
90 Onehunga Mall