Nelson Bays Insurance Brokers Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 06 Mar 2002. 9429036610266 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Insurance broking service" (ANZSIC K642040) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been supervised by 4 directors: Mark Anthony Emery-Hall - an active director whose contract started on 06 Mar 2002,
Sandra Clements - an active director whose contract started on 06 Mar 2002,
Averil Andrew West - an inactive director whose contract started on 06 Mar 2002 and was terminated on 01 Dec 2016,
Graeme West - an inactive director whose contract started on 06 Mar 2002 and was terminated on 01 Dec 2016.
Updated on 05 Sep 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 4 addresses the company registered, specifically: 29 Somerset Terrace, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (registered address),
29 Somerset Terrace, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (physical address),
29 Somerset Terrace, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (service address),
29 Somerset Terrace, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 (office address) among others.
Nelson Bays Insurance Brokers Limited had been using 1St Floor, 144 Collingwood Street, Nelson East, Nelson as their physical address up to 14 Sep 2020.
A total of 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group includes 100 shares (10 per cent) held by 1 entity. There is also a second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 900 shares (90 per cent).
Other active addresses
Address #4: 29 Somerset Terrace, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Registered & physical & service address used from 14 Sep 2020
Principal place of activity
29 Somerset Terrace, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 1st Floor, 144 Collingwood Street, Nelson East, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 13 Sep 2019 to 14 Sep 2020
Address #2: 29 Somerset Terrace, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Physical address used from 02 Oct 2018 to 13 Sep 2019
Address #3: 1st Floor, 144 Collingwood Street, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Sep 2014 to 14 Sep 2020
Address #4: 1st Floor, 144 Collingwood Street, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Physical address used from 09 Sep 2014 to 02 Oct 2018
Address #5: 1st Floor, Alma House, 83a Buxton Square, Nelson New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Jan 2007 to 09 Sep 2014
Address #6: Alma House, 83a Buxton Square, Nelson
Registered & physical address used from 06 Mar 2002 to 08 Jan 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 06 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Clements, Sandra |
Stoke Nelson 7011 New Zealand |
06 Mar 2002 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 900 | |||
Individual | Hall, Mark |
Stoke Nelson 7011 New Zealand |
06 Mar 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | West, Graeme |
Nelson |
06 Mar 2002 - 14 Dec 2016 |
Individual | West, Averil |
Nelson |
06 Mar 2002 - 14 Dec 2016 |
Mark Anthony Emery-hall - Director
Appointment date: 06 Mar 2002
Address: Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Dec 2010
Sandra Clements - Director
Appointment date: 06 Mar 2002
Address: Stoke, Nelson, 7011 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Dec 2010
Averil Andrew West - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Mar 2002
Termination date: 01 Dec 2016
Address: The Wood, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2003
Graeme West - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 06 Mar 2002
Termination date: 01 Dec 2016
Address: The Wood, Nelson, 7010 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Apr 2003
Teen Outreach Inc
144 Collingwood Street
Maruia Trust
142 Collingwood Street
Wild Places Trust
142 Collingwood Street
140 Collingwood Limited
140 Collingwood Street
Nelson Consulting Engineers Limited
140 Collingwood Street
The Tasman Broadcasting Trust
143 Collingwood Street
Aegis Financial Services Limited
1/38 Buxton Square
Assured Limited
266 Hardy Street
First Class Insurance Limited
56a Buxton Square
Independent Financial Advisers Association Limited
94 Nile Street
Llewellynco Limited
266 Hardy Street
T/as A Thomas Sales Consulting Limited
C/-nelson Bays Accounting Limited