Psw Nominees Limited, a registered company, was launched on 08 Jul 2002. 9429036453221 is the NZ business number it was issued. "University operation" (ANZSIC P810220) is how the company has been categorised. This company has been run by 11 directors: Margaret Jane Harrop - an active director whose contract started on 21 Feb 2003,
Mary Anne Costelloe - an active director whose contract started on 02 Dec 2010,
Kelsi Sian Freer - an active director whose contract started on 21 Jul 2015,
Miaana Ellen Mohikura Patene - an active director whose contract started on 24 May 2019,
Miaana Ellen Mohikura Walden - an active director whose contract started on 24 May 2019.
Updated on 24 Jul 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 140 Junction Road, Rd 1, New Plymouth, 4371 (category: postal, office).
Psw Nominees Limited had been using 53 Dawson Street, New Plymouth as their registered address up to 31 Aug 2016.
All company shares (1 share exactly) are under control of a single group consisting of 5 entities, namely:
Khatri, Pramod Kumar (an individual) located at New Plymouth, New Plymouth postcode 4310,
Patene, Miaana Ellen Mohikura (a director) located at New Plymouth, New Plymouth postcode 4310,
Freer, Kelsi Sian (a director) located at Frankleigh Park, New Plymouth postcode 4310.
Principal place of activity
140 Junction Road, Rd 1, New Plymouth, 4371 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: 53 Dawson Street, New Plymouth, 4340 New Zealand
Registered address used from 29 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2016
Address #2: C/-mooney And Webb, 53 Dawson Street, New Plymouth, 4340 New Zealand
Registered address used from 09 Aug 2013 to 29 Jul 2015
Address #3: 53 Dawson Street, New Plymouth, 4340 New Zealand
Physical address used from 17 Dec 2010 to 31 Aug 2016
Address #4: C/-mooney And Webb, 53 Dawson Street, New Plymouth, 4340 New Zealand
Registered address used from 17 Dec 2010 to 09 Aug 2013
Address #5: C/- Nicholsons, 131 Powderham Street, New Plymouth New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 08 Jul 2002 to 17 Dec 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1
Annual return filing month: August
Financial report filing month: March
Annual return last filed: 02 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1 | |||
Individual | Khatri, Pramod Kumar |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2023 - |
Director | Patene, Miaana Ellen Mohikura |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
12 Mar 2020 - |
Director | Freer, Kelsi Sian |
Frankleigh Park New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
23 Aug 2016 - |
Individual | Costelloe, Mary Anne |
Lower Vogeltown New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
09 Dec 2010 - |
Individual | Harrop, Margaret Jane |
Mount Victoria Wellington 6011 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Chilcott, Reginald Norman |
New Plymouth |
08 Jul 2002 - 09 Dec 2010 |
Individual | Wilson, Moray Dugald Stuart |
Inglewood New Zealand |
08 Jul 2002 - 09 Dec 2010 |
Individual | Veitch, Paul Davidson |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
09 Dec 2010 - 19 Aug 2019 |
Individual | Pickering, John Lionel |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2002 - 12 Mar 2020 |
Individual | Pickering, John Lionel |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 New Zealand |
08 Jul 2002 - 12 Mar 2020 |
Margaret Jane Harrop - Director
Appointment date: 21 Feb 2003
Address: Mount Victoria, Wellington, 6011 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Apr 2016
Mary Anne Costelloe - Director
Appointment date: 02 Dec 2010
Address: Lower Vogeltown, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2021
Address: New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 19 Aug 2019
Address: New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Jul 2018
Address: New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Feb 2015
Address: New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 25 Jul 2017
Kelsi Sian Freer - Director
Appointment date: 21 Jul 2015
Address: Frankleigh Park, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Jun 2017
Address: Blagdon, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Jul 2015
Miaana Ellen Mohikura Patene - Director
Appointment date: 24 May 2019
Address: New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 24 May 2019
Miaana Ellen Mohikura Walden - Director
Appointment date: 24 May 2019
Address: New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 24 May 2019
Pramod Kumar Khatri - Director
Appointment date: 16 Mar 2023
Address: New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Mar 2023
John Lionel Pickering - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Jul 2002
Termination date: 19 Sep 2019
Address: New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Aug 2015
Paul Davidson Veitch - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 02 Dec 2010
Termination date: 22 May 2019
Address: New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2015
Reginald Norman Chilcott - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Jul 2002
Termination date: 02 Dec 2010
Address: New Plymouth, 4310 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Jul 2002
Moray Dugald Stuart Wilson - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Jul 2002
Termination date: 02 Dec 2010
Address: Inglewood, Taranaki, 4330 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Feb 2007
Matthew Newton Francis Allen - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 08 Jul 2002
Termination date: 29 May 2003
Address: Rd 4, New Plymouth,
Address used since 08 Jul 2002
Integrity Counselling Associates Charitable Trust
53 Dawson Street
Eight Ball Entertainment Limited
74 Vivian Street
Juffermans Surveyors Limited
51 Dawson Street
Vmc Limited
56-58 Vivian Street
Stop In Charitable Trust
C/-st Mary's Church
Mothermentor Charitable Trust
56 Dawson Street
Dawnfinder Limited
28 Pentland Avenue
Ecentre Limited
C/-cooper Rapley
New Paradigm Solutions Limited
195 Ruapehu Drive
S & C Devine Company Limited
13 Mission Street
Single Form Limited
80 Meadowbank Road
Uunz Institute Of Business Limited
411 Great North Road