Crave Nz Limited, a registered company, was launched on 16 Jul 2002. 9429036410170 is the NZ business number it was issued. "Wholesale trade nec" (ANZSIC F373970) is how the company was categorised. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Anne Elizabeth Devitt - an active director whose contract began on 16 Jul 2002,
Jennie Anne Marie Prosser - an active director whose contract began on 01 Aug 2019,
Georgina Maryanne Prosser - an active director whose contract began on 01 Aug 2019.
Updated on 15 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: Po Box 48155, Silverstream, Upper Hutt, 5142 (type: postal, office).
Crave Nz Limited had been using 11 Tait Crescent, Featherston as their registered address up until 25 Jul 2003.
Previous aliases used by this company, as we established at BizDb, included: from 18 Dec 2013 to 08 Aug 2018 they were called Anntix Limited, from 01 Oct 2013 to 18 Dec 2013 they were called Anntics Limited and from 16 Jul 2002 to 01 Oct 2013 they were called Tarere Falls Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders (3 groups). The first group consists of 25 shares (25 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 25 shares (25 per cent). Lastly we have the third share allotment (50 shares 50 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Principal place of activity
50 Pinehaven Road, Pinehaven, Upper Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Previous address
Address #1: 11 Tait Crescent, Featherston
Registered & physical address used from 16 Jul 2002 to 25 Jul 2003
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: July
Annual return last filed: 23 Jul 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Individual | Prosser, Jennie Anne-marie |
Pinehaven Upper Hutt 5019 New Zealand |
07 Aug 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 25 | |||
Individual | Prosser, Georgina Maryanne |
Pinehaven Upper Hutt 5019 New Zealand |
07 Aug 2018 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Devitt, Anne Elizabeth |
Featherston Featherston 5710 New Zealand |
16 Jul 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | George, Allan Gregory Thomas |
Featherston |
16 Jul 2002 - 17 Oct 2008 |
Anne Elizabeth Devitt - Director
Appointment date: 16 Jul 2002
Address: Featherston, South Wairarapa, 5710 New Zealand
Address used since 31 Aug 2010
Jennie Anne Marie Prosser - Director
Appointment date: 01 Aug 2019
Address: Pinehaven, Upper Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2019
Georgina Maryanne Prosser - Director
Appointment date: 01 Aug 2019
Address: Pinehaven, Upper Hutt, 5019 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Aug 2019
K And E Grace Global Mission Inc
7 Clifford Square
Featherston Memorial Rsa Incorporated
57 Fox Street
Hoskin Consulting Limited
4a Clifford Square
Featherston Bowling Club Incorporated
66 Fox Street
Fell Locomotive Museum Incorporated
Corner State Highway 2 & Lyon Street
Intergalactic Entertainment Limited
13 Hickson Street
Gilmac New Zealand Limited
16 Royal Street
Image Optical Group Nz Limited
21 Southdown Drive
New Zealand Ammunition Company Limited
155a Katherine Mansfield Drive
Peepal Tree Enterprises Limited
203 Parkes Line Road
Wholesale Connection Limited
71 Pine Avenue
Wizard Imports Limited
57 California Drive