Quail Valley Estate Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 12 Sep 2002. 9429036330171 is the business number it was issued. This company has been run by 4 directors: Keith Alan Offord - an active director whose contract began on 12 Sep 2002,
Heather Rosemary Peek - an active director whose contract began on 29 Nov 2005,
Caroline Anne Mccarthy - an inactive director whose contract began on 24 Feb 2010 and was terminated on 31 Mar 2015,
Andrew James Cooper - an inactive director whose contract began on 12 Sep 2002 and was terminated on 23 Aug 2004.
Updated on 04 Aug 2024, the BizDb database contains detailed information about 1 address: 58 Arthur Street, Blenheim, 7201 (type: registered, physical).
Quail Valley Estate Limited had been using 65 Seymour Street, Blenheim as their registered address up to 24 Jan 2022.
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group consists of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Next there is the second group which includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 65 Seymour Street, Blenheim New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 30 Sep 2004 to 24 Jan 2022
Address: 19 Henry Street, Blenheim
Physical & registered address used from 12 Sep 2002 to 30 Sep 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 18 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | Kaos Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038858208 |
Blenheim 7201 New Zealand |
21 Oct 2004 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Peek, Heather Rosemary |
Picton |
11 Jul 2006 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Offord, Keith Alan |
Tory Channel Marlborough Sounds |
12 Sep 2002 - 21 Oct 2004 |
Individual | Cooper, Andrew James |
Renwick |
12 Sep 2002 - 21 Oct 2004 |
Keith Alan Offord - Director
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2002
Address: Picton, 7220 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Oct 2015
Heather Rosemary Peek - Director
Appointment date: 29 Nov 2005
Address: Picton, 7220 New Zealand
Address used since 28 Oct 2015
Caroline Anne Mccarthy - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 24 Feb 2010
Termination date: 31 Mar 2015
Address: Witherlea, Blenheim, 7201 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Oct 2010
Andrew James Cooper - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 12 Sep 2002
Termination date: 23 Aug 2004
Address: Renwick,
Address used since 18 Sep 2002
Port Underwood Contracting Services Limited
65 Seymour Street
Pjs Investments 2013 Limited
65 Seymour Street
Hall Family Farms Limited
65 Seymour Street
Berakah Vineyard Management Limited
65 Seymour Street
Lower Waihopai Dam Limited
65 Seymour Street
Rossmore Limited
65 Seymour Street