Micka Limited, a registered company, was launched on 25 Oct 2002. 9429036266968 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is how the company was categorised. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Peter Andre Hollander - an active director whose contract began on 25 Oct 2002,
Maria Jolanda Lucienne Elisabeth Zonnenberg - an inactive director whose contract began on 25 Oct 2002 and was terminated on 02 Jul 2011.
Updated on 20 Aug 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 3 addresses this company uses, namely: 19 Revell Drive, Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112 (registered address),
19 Revell Drive, Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112 (service address),
19 Revell Drive, Ohouiti, Tauranga, 3112 (registered address),
19 Revell Drive, Ohouiti, Tauranga, 3112 (service address) among others.
Micka Limited had been using 5 Diamond Head, Hairini, Tauranga as their registered address up until 11 Oct 2023.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 500 shares) - Hollander, Peter Andre - located at 3112, Ohauiti, Tauranga.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 5 Diamond Head, Hairini, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Registered & service address used from 14 Oct 2014 to 11 Oct 2023
Address #2: 107 Panorama Drive, Rd 5 Welcome Bay Tauranga New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 10 Aug 2004 to 14 Oct 2014
Address #3: 110 College Place, Tauranga
Physical & registered address used from 25 Oct 2002 to 10 Aug 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 24 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 500 | |||
Individual | Hollander, Peter Andre |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 New Zealand |
25 Oct 2002 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Zonnenberg, Maria Jolanda Lucienne Elisabeth |
Rd 5 Welcome Bay Tauranga New Zealand |
25 Oct 2002 - 10 Oct 2013 |
Peter Andre Hollander - Director
Appointment date: 25 Oct 2002
Address: Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Oct 2023
Address: Hairini, Tauranga, 3112 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Oct 2014
Maria Jolanda Lucienne Elisabeth Zonnenberg - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 25 Oct 2002
Termination date: 02 Jul 2011
Address: Rd 5 Welcome Bay Tauranga,
Address used since 03 Aug 2004
Safetywash Nz Limited
5 Diamond Head
Stellar Consultants Limited
31 Diamond Head
L&d Happiness Limited
6 Onyx Way
Servicebop Limited
3 Onyx Way
Acoustics Certificates Limited
30 Poike Rd
Recordsituation Limited
30 Poike Road
Bristol Enterprises Limited
Level 1, 120 Eleventh Avenue
Dabecko Limited
26 Hollister Lane
Kajia Freedom Limited
47 Egmont Street
Mt Amos Investments Limited
44 Awaiti Place
Sandala Limited
111 Haukore St
Winmarx Holdings Limited
5b Olivine Street