Kenna Farms Limited, a registered company, was started on 22 May 2003. 9429035970286 is the NZBN it was issued. This company has been run by 2 directors: Maurice James Kenna - an active director whose contract began on 22 May 2003,
June Lorraine Kenna - an active director whose contract began on 22 May 2003.
Last updated on 23 Jul 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 2, 1 Wesley Street, Pukekohe, 2120 (type: registered, service).
Kenna Farms Limited had been using 14A Main Road, Te Kauwhata, Te Kauwhata as their physical address up to 27 Aug 2018.
All shares (1000 shares exactly) are owned by a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
Kenna, Maurice James (a director) located at Te Kauwhata postcode 3781,
Kenna, June Lorraine (a director) located at Te Kauwhata postcode 3781.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 14a Main Road, Te Kauwhata, Te Kauwhata, 3710 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 13 Sep 2010 to 27 Aug 2018
Address #2: 14a Main Street, Te Kauwhata New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 22 May 2003 to 13 Sep 2010
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 08 Aug 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Director | Kenna, Maurice James |
Te Kauwhata 3781 New Zealand |
17 Apr 2024 - |
Director | Kenna, June Lorraine |
Te Kauwhata 3781 New Zealand |
17 Apr 2024 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Kenna, June Lorraine |
Te Kauwhata |
22 May 2003 - 17 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Stevenson, Graham Clive |
Te Kauwhata Te Kauwhata 3710 New Zealand |
22 May 2003 - 17 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Kenna, Maurice James |
Te Kauwhata |
22 May 2003 - 17 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Kenna, Maurice James |
Te Kauwhata |
22 May 2003 - 17 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Kenna, June Lorraine |
Te Kauwhata |
22 May 2003 - 17 Apr 2024 |
Individual | Stevenson, Graham Clive |
Te Kauwhata Te Kauwhata 3710 New Zealand |
22 May 2003 - 17 Apr 2024 |
Maurice James Kenna - Director
Appointment date: 22 May 2003
Address: Te Kauwhata, 3781 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2015
June Lorraine Kenna - Director
Appointment date: 22 May 2003
Address: Te Kauwhata, 3781 New Zealand
Address used since 01 Sep 2015
All About Apparel Limited
14a Main Road
B & B Farms Limited
14a Main Road
Rg & Dj Holdings Limited
14a Main Road
Tk Trustee Company Limited
14a Main Road
Wheeler Enterprises Limited
14a Main Road
Bm & Gi Watson Limited
14a Main Road