Hua Xiang Homes Limited, a registered company, was started on 10 Jun 2003. 9429035937470 is the number it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Canxiang Chen - an active director whose contract began on 10 Jun 2003,
Yuqin Chen - an active director whose contract began on 30 Mar 2021.
Last updated on 06 Feb 2022, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: 145 Flat Bush School Road, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 (types include: physical, registered).
Hua Xiang Homes Limited had been using 52 Coachman Drive, Dannemora, Auckland as their registered address up until 14 Jul 2016.
Past names used by the company, as we identified at BizDb, included: from 10 Jun 2003 to 13 Jan 2004 they were named Hua Xiang Trading Limited.
A total of 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders (2 groups). The first group is comprised of 50 shares (50 per cent) held by 1 entity. Moving on the second group includes 1 shareholder in control of 50 shares (50 per cent).
Previous addresses
Address: 52 Coachman Drive, Dannemora, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Aug 2008 to 14 Jul 2016
Address: 16 Kenderdine Road, Papatoetoe, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 29 Sep 2006 to 26 Aug 2008
Address: 16 Akenderdine Rd, Papatoetoe
Physical & registered address used from 10 Jun 2003 to 29 Sep 2006
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 26 Sep 2021
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Yuqin Chen |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
30 Mar 2021 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 50 | |||
Individual | Canxiang Chen |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 New Zealand |
10 Jun 2003 - |
Canxiang Chen - Director
Appointment date: 10 Jun 2003
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Jul 2016
Yuqin Chen - Director
Appointment date: 30 Mar 2021
Address: Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 New Zealand
Address used since 30 Mar 2021
Koi Catering Limited
151 Flat Bush School Road
Wu And Lieu Holding Limited
170 Flat Bush School Road
Ekam 2009 Enterprises Limited
121 Flat Bush School Road
Pacify Limited
121 Flat Bush School Road
Rgsg Mangat Limited
174 Flat Bush School Road
Mva Family Trustee Limited
7 Moville Drive