Cimmerian Limited was started on 27 Aug 2003 and issued a business number of 9429035847298. This registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Roger Rutherford - an active director whose contract started on 23 May 2007,
Karen Langkilde - an inactive director whose contract started on 27 Aug 2003 and was terminated on 25 May 2007.
According to our information (updated on 29 Aug 2024), the company registered 1 address: Apartment 9A, 4 Short Street, Auckland City, 1010 (type: physical, service).
Up until 14 Nov 2018, Cimmerian Limited had been using Apartment 8C, 22 Queen Street, Auckland City as their physical address.
BizDb identified former names for the company: from 27 Aug 2003 to 24 Dec 2009 they were named Kewpiecorp Limited.
A total of 100 shares are allocated to 1 group (1 sole shareholder). In the first group, 100 shares are held by 1 entity, namely:
Rutherford, Roger (an individual) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. Cimmerian Limited has been classified as "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040).
Previous addresses
Address: Apartment 8c, 22 Queen Street, Auckland City, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 14 Nov 2016 to 14 Nov 2018
Address: Apartment 1520, 2 Beach Road, Auckland City, 1010 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 20 Oct 2014 to 14 Nov 2016
Address: Apartment 14a, 1 Emily Place, Auckland City, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 09 Nov 2010 to 20 Oct 2014
Address: Apartment 2904, 6-8 Lorne Street, Auckland City, 1010 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 11 Jan 2010 to 09 Nov 2010
Address: 3 Mars Avenue, Sandringham, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 09 Jan 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
Address: 36 Mccullough Avenue, Mt Roskill, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 10 Jan 2008 to 09 Jan 2009
Address: 15 Davies Street, Kensington, Whangarei
Registered & physical address used from 16 Nov 2006 to 10 Jan 2008
Address: 28 Moana Ave, Onehunga, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 22 Sep 2005 to 16 Nov 2006
Address: 704/163 Queen Street, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 27 Aug 2003 to 22 Sep 2005
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: November
Annual return last filed: 11 Nov 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Rutherford, Roger |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
03 Jan 2008 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Langkilde, Karen |
Sandringham Auckland |
27 Aug 2003 - 03 Jan 2009 |
Roger Rutherford - Director
Appointment date: 23 May 2007
Address: Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 15 Nov 2020
Address: 22 Queen Street, Auckland City, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 04 Nov 2016
Address: 4 Short Street, Auckland City, 1010 New Zealand
Address used since 06 Nov 2018
Karen Langkilde - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 27 Aug 2003
Termination date: 25 May 2007
Address: Kensington, Whangarei,
Address used since 09 Nov 2006
Fhl Limited
22 Queen St
Hine Rangi Trust
C/o D F Cotter, Chartered Accountant
Hawea 2017 Limited
1st Floor, Dilworth Building
Rocket Dental Limited
Shop 102 Floor 1 Dilworth Building, 22 Queen Street
Downtown Dental Surgery Limited
Suite 102, 1st Floor, Dilworth Building
Strata Title Administration Limited
1st Floor Dilworth Building
Eastcliffe Capital Limited
Staples Rodway Ltd
Pari Passu Limited
Staples Rodway Ltd
Scfl Properties Limited
Staples Rodway
Southern Cross Finance Limited
Staples Rodway
Southern Cross Partners Limited
Staples Rodway
Staples Rodway Asset Management Limited
Staples Rodway