Club Finance Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 30 Sep 2003. 9429035791898 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. "Finance company operation" (ANZSIC K623010) is how the company is categorised. This company has been managed by 7 directors: David Crawford Gibson - an active director whose contract started on 17 Aug 2017,
Leon Herselman - an active director whose contract started on 17 Aug 2017,
Douglas Lloyd Somers-Edgar - an inactive director whose contract started on 04 May 2004 and was terminated on 17 Aug 2017,
Rory Adrian Hassett - an inactive director whose contract started on 26 Nov 2007 and was terminated on 20 Feb 2017,
Philip Warren Markwick - an inactive director whose contract started on 30 Apr 2004 and was terminated on 04 Oct 2007.
Updated on 29 Aug 2024, our database contains detailed information about 1 address: Norfolk House, 18 High Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: postal, delivery).
Club Finance Limited had been using Unit 2, 222 Bush Road, Albany, Auckland as their registered address up until 31 Aug 2017.
One entity owns all company shares (exactly 100 shares) - F & i Holdings Limited - located at 1010, Auckland Central, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
Norfolk House, 18 High Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address #1: Unit 2, 222 Bush Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 07 Mar 2013 to 31 Aug 2017
Address #2: Level 1, 222 Bush Road, Albany, North Shore City 0632 New Zealand
Physical & registered address used from 04 Feb 2009 to 07 Mar 2013
Address #3: Derek P Storey & Associates Ltd, Unit B, 222 Bush Road, Albany, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 03 Oct 2008 to 04 Feb 2009
Address #4: 2b George Bourke Drive, Mt Wellington, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 06 Jun 2007 to 03 Oct 2008
Address #5: 2a George Bourke Drive, Mt Wellington, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 15 May 2007 to 06 Jun 2007
Address #6: 8a Sylvia Park Road, Mt Wellington, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 04 Jul 2005 to 15 May 2007
Address #7: Level 1, 5 Ryan Place, Manukau
Registered & physical address used from 12 Aug 2004 to 04 Jul 2005
Address #8: 2/69 St Stepehns Avenue, Parnell, Auckland
Physical address used from 12 May 2004 to 12 Aug 2004
Address #9: 2/69 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland
Registered address used from 12 May 2004 to 12 Aug 2004
Address #10: 272 Manukau Road, Greenwoods Corner, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 30 Sep 2003 to 12 May 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 13 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Entity (NZ Limited Company) | F & I Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035792062 |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 New Zealand |
05 May 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Stafford, Barry Vaughan Clive |
Remuera Auckland |
05 May 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Ultimate Holding Company
David Crawford Gibson - Director
Appointment date: 17 Aug 2017
Address: Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Aug 2017
Leon Herselman - Director
Appointment date: 17 Aug 2017
Address: Torbay, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Aug 2017
Douglas Lloyd Somers-edgar - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 04 May 2004
Termination date: 17 Aug 2017
Address: Waiake, Auckland, 0630 New Zealand
Address used since 27 Feb 2013
Rory Adrian Hassett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 26 Nov 2007
Termination date: 20 Feb 2017
Address: 69 St Stephens Avenue, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 New Zealand
Address used since 08 Feb 2010
Philip Warren Markwick - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2004
Termination date: 04 Oct 2007
Address: Greenhithe, Auckland,
Address used since 30 Apr 2004
Rory Adrian Hassett - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Apr 2004
Termination date: 03 Oct 2007
Address: Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 30 Apr 2004
Barry Vaughan Clive Stafford - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 30 Sep 2003
Termination date: 30 Apr 2004
Address: Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 30 Sep 2003
Sts 13 Limited
18 High Street
Sjf Limited
Level 1norfolk House
Blong Trustee Services Limited
18 High Street
Mr Trustee Company 2013 Limited
Norfolk House, 18 High Street
Ashcroft Trustee Services Limited
18 High Street
Vulcan Trustee Co (2013) Limited
18 High Street
Fee Funders Nz Limited
Level 10
Fresh Finance Limited
18 High Street
Guardian Asset Securities Limited
35 Chancery Street
Maranello Limited
Unit 1, 43 High Street
Nectar Nz Limited
18 High Street
Oxford Finance Limited
Level 17, Auckland Club Tower