Itala Investments Limited, a registered company, was started on 22 Oct 2003. 9429035699439 is the business number it was issued. The company has been managed by 2 directors: Tessa Oliver - an active director whose contract started on 22 Oct 2003,
Theodorus Jacobus Oliver - an inactive director whose contract started on 22 Oct 2003 and was terminated on 24 Feb 2022.
Itala Investments Limited had been using 50 Jandell Crescent, Bucklands Beach, Auckland as their physical address up until 07 Apr 2005.
Previous addresses
Address: 50 Jandell Crescent, Bucklands Beach, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 09 Mar 2004 to 07 Apr 2005
Address: 13b Cambric Place, Pakuranga, Auckland
Physical & registered address used from 22 Oct 2003 to 09 Mar 2004
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 1000
Annual return filing month: February
Annual return last filed: 19 Feb 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 1000 | |||
Individual | Oliver, Tessa |
Bucklands Beach Auckland New Zealand |
02 Mar 2004 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Oliver, Theodorus Jacobus |
Bucklands Beach Auckland New Zealand |
02 Mar 2004 - 24 Feb 2022 |
Tessa Oliver - Director
Appointment date: 22 Oct 2003
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Feb 2016
Theodorus Jacobus Oliver - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 22 Oct 2003
Termination date: 24 Feb 2022
Address: Bucklands Beach, Auckland, 2012 New Zealand
Address used since 17 Feb 2016
Thete Properties Limited
34 Loloma Drive
Typhoon Glasshouse Equipment Limited
34 Loloma Drive
Sns Blessed Limited
41 Loloma Drive
Unic International (nz) Limited
41 Cornelian Crescent
Back To The Source Charitable Trust
45 Loloma Drive
August Limited
52 Cornelian Crescent