Molving Enterprises Limited was started on 20 Nov 2003 and issued a business number of 9429035678151. The registered LTD company has been supervised by 2 directors: Hans Erik Molving - an active director whose contract began on 03 Feb 2012,
Gloria Iris Masters - an inactive director whose contract began on 20 Nov 2003 and was terminated on 05 Mar 2012.
According to our information (last updated on 05 Aug 2024), the company uses 1 address: 207 Vipond Road, Whangaparaoa (type: registered, physical).
A total of 100 shares are allotted to 0 groups (0 shareholders in total).
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: September
Annual return last filed: 27 Sep 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Molving, Hans Erik Koefoed |
Whangaparaoa |
20 Nov 2003 - 10 Jun 2022 |
Individual | Molving, Hans Erik Koefoed |
Whangaparaoa |
20 Nov 2003 - 10 Jun 2022 |
Individual | Masters, Gloria Iris |
Whangaparaoa |
20 Nov 2003 - 10 Jun 2022 |
Entity | Hibiscus Independent Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036059744 Company Number: 1287393 |
Orewa Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
20 Nov 2003 - 10 Jun 2022 |
Entity | Hibiscus Independent Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036059744 Company Number: 1287393 |
Orewa Orewa 0931 New Zealand |
20 Nov 2003 - 10 Jun 2022 |
Individual | Molving, Hans Erik Koefoed |
Whangaparaoa |
20 Nov 2003 - 10 Jun 2022 |
Individual | Molving, Hans Erik Koefoed |
Whangaparaoa |
20 Nov 2003 - 10 Jun 2022 |
Individual | Masters, Gloria Iris |
Whangaparaoa |
20 Nov 2003 - 10 Jun 2022 |
Individual | Masters, Gloria Iris |
Whangaparaoa |
20 Nov 2003 - 10 Jun 2022 |
Hans Erik Molving - Director
Appointment date: 03 Feb 2012
Address: Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 03 Feb 2012
Gloria Iris Masters - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 20 Nov 2003
Termination date: 05 Mar 2012
Address: Whangaparaoa, 0932 New Zealand
Address used since 20 Nov 2003
Patuwai Holdings Limited
2/209 Vipond Road
Western Arm Marina Limited
212 Vipond Road
Inert Holdings Limited
212 Vipond Road
Shuffle Limited
212 Vipond Road
Cowan Bay Farm Limited
212 Vipond Road
Otis Trustee Limited
212 Vipond Road Stanmore Bay