Melzavin Limited, a registered company, was incorporated on 08 Dec 2003. 9429035629757 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been managed by 2 directors: Gavin Kenley Pendergrast - an active director whose contract began on 08 Dec 2003,
Demelza Marie Pendergrast - an active director whose contract began on 08 Dec 2003.
Updated on 14 Sep 2024, our data contains detailed information about 1 address: 415 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 (category: registered, physical).
Melzavin Limited had been using C/-Walton Railton & Co Ltd, Cnr 8Th Ave & Cameron Road, Tauranga as their physical address up until 20 Mar 2008.
More names for the company, as we managed to find at BizDb, included: from 08 Dec 2003 to 27 Mar 2020 they were named Melzavin Limited.
A total of 120 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders (3 groups). The first group includes 100 shares (83.33 per cent) held by 3 entities. Moving on the second group consists of 1 shareholder in control of 10 shares (8.33 per cent). Finally the next share allotment (10 shares 8.33 per cent) made up of 1 entity.
Previous addresses
Address: C/-walton Railton & Co Ltd, Cnr 8th Ave & Cameron Road, Tauranga
Physical & registered address used from 15 Mar 2007 to 20 Mar 2008
Address: 1 Alfred Street, Hamilton
Physical & registered address used from 08 Dec 2003 to 15 Mar 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 120
Annual return filing month: August
Annual return last filed: 12 Aug 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation #1 Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | Ottoway, John Harry |
R D 3 Tauranga New Zealand |
24 Oct 2007 - |
Individual | Pendergrast, Gavin Kenley |
Rd 3 Tauranga |
24 Oct 2007 - |
Individual | Pendergrast, Demelza Marie |
Rd 3 Tauranga New Zealand |
08 Dec 2003 - |
Shares Allocation #2 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Pendergrast, Gavin Kenley |
Rd 3 Tauranga |
24 Oct 2007 - |
Shares Allocation #3 Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Pendergrast, Demelza Marie |
Rd 3 Tauranga New Zealand |
08 Dec 2003 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | Pendergrast, Gavin Kenley |
Rd 3 Tauranga |
08 Dec 2003 - 21 Aug 2007 |
Gavin Kenley Pendergrast - Director
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2003
Address: Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Aug 2007
Demelza Marie Pendergrast - Director
Appointment date: 08 Dec 2003
Address: Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173 New Zealand
Address used since 21 Aug 2007
Zj Builders Limited
Suite 1
C A Murray Trustee Company Limited
Suite 1
Belmondo Bakery & Cafe Limited
415 Cameron Road
Pcm Properties Limited
Suite 1
Crows Haulage Limited
Suite 1
E & M Farms Limited
Suite 1