Fizban Inc Limited, a registered company, was launched on 16 Dec 2004. 9429035037521 is the NZ business identifier it was issued. This company has been managed by 3 directors: Grant Peter Ng - an active director whose contract started on 16 Dec 2004,
David William Loo - an active director whose contract started on 29 Apr 2017,
Jew Moy Ng - an inactive director whose contract started on 16 Dec 2004 and was terminated on 22 Mar 2017.
Last updated on 30 Aug 2024, the BizDb data contains detailed information about 1 address: Level 5, 235 Broadway, Auckland, 1149 (type: physical, registered).
Fizban Inc Limited had been using Level 5, 12 O'connell Street, Auckland as their registered address up until 22 Nov 2016.
A single entity owns all company shares (exactly 10 shares) - Ng, Grant Peter - located at 1149, Epsom, Auckland.
Principal place of activity
Level 5, 235 Broadway, Auckland, 1149 New Zealand
Previous addresses
Address: Level 5, 12 O'connell Street, Auckland New Zealand
Registered & physical address used from 26 Sep 2007 to 22 Nov 2016
Address: Hornabrook Macdonald Lawyers, 11 Bacons Lane, Mezzanine Level, Chancery, Auckland
Registered & physical address used from 16 Dec 2004 to 26 Sep 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 10
Annual return filing month: October
Annual return last filed: 25 Oct 2023
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 10 | |||
Individual | Ng, Grant Peter |
Epsom Auckland |
16 Dec 2004 - |
Grant Peter Ng - Director
Appointment date: 16 Dec 2004
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Dec 2004
David William Loo - Director
Appointment date: 29 Apr 2017
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 29 Apr 2017
Jew Moy Ng - Director (Inactive)
Appointment date: 16 Dec 2004
Termination date: 22 Mar 2017
Address: Epsom, Auckland, 1023 New Zealand
Address used since 16 Dec 2004
Arilje Investments Limited
Suite 5, 235 Broadway
Arnott's New Zealand Limited
Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited
Level 6, 135 Broadway
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited
Level 4, 19 Morgan Street
Your Property Services Limited
Level 4, 19 Morgan Street