J-Cas Commercial Limited, a registered company, was registered on 10 Feb 2005. 9429034948880 is the number it was issued. The company has been supervised by 2 directors: Jozef Henricus De Kort - an active director whose contract started on 10 Feb 2005,
Cindy Patricia De Kort - an active director whose contract started on 10 Feb 2005.
Last updated on 29 Jul 2024, BizDb's database contains detailed information about 1 address: 39 George Street, Timaru, 7910 (category: physical, registered).
J-Cas Commercial Limited had been using 39 George Street, Timaru as their registered address until 27 May 2010.
Previous aliases for the company, as we found at BizDb, included: from 10 Feb 2005 to 25 Feb 2008 they were named Jcas Commercial Limited.
All company shares (100 shares exactly) are under control of a single group consisting of 2 entities, namely:
De Kort, Cindy Patricia (an individual) located at Rd 12, Methven postcode 7782,
De Kort, Jozef Henricus (an individual) located at Rd 12, Methven postcode 7782.
Previous addresses
Address #1: 39 George Street, Timaru
Registered & physical address used from 23 Nov 2007 to 27 May 2010
Address #2: Macdonald Pearce Perniskie, 16 Main Street, Gore
Registered & physical address used from 28 May 2007 to 23 Nov 2007
Address #3: Macdonald & Associates, 16 Main Street, Gore
Registered & physical address used from 10 Feb 2005 to 28 May 2007
Basic Financial info
Total number of Shares: 100
Annual return filing month: May
Annual return last filed: 08 May 2024
Country of origin: NZ
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Shares Allocation Number of Shares: 100 | |||
Individual | De Kort, Cindy Patricia |
Rd 12 Methven 7782 New Zealand |
10 Feb 2005 - |
Individual | De Kort, Jozef Henricus |
Rd 12 Methven 7782 New Zealand |
10 Feb 2005 - |
Previous Shareholders
Shareholder Type | Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Individual | De Kort, Shane William |
Rd 2 Lauriston 7772 New Zealand |
27 May 2019 - 30 May 2022 |
Individual | Wood, Karl Haswell |
Rd 7 Gore 9777 New Zealand |
10 Feb 2005 - 27 May 2019 |
Jozef Henricus De Kort - Director
Appointment date: 10 Feb 2005
Address: Rd 12, Methven, 7782 New Zealand
Address used since 30 May 2022
Address: Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772 New Zealand
Address used since 20 May 2011
Cindy Patricia De Kort - Director
Appointment date: 10 Feb 2005
Address: Rd 12, Methven, 7782 New Zealand
Address used since 30 May 2022
Address: Rd 2, Ashburton, 7772 New Zealand
Address used since 20 May 2011
Piccolo Bambino Limited
39 George Street
Wurmitzer Surgical Limited
39 George Street
Heigold Motors Limited
39 George Street
Silver Star Designs Limited
39 George Street
Gladstone Bar Limited
39 George Street
Mcintosh Catering Limited
39 George Street